Hardy v. Nissan North America, Inc.
Plaintiff: John K Hardy
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00838
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Tom S Lee
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily G. Barr on behalf of Nissan North America, Inc. (Barr, Emily)
January 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Walter J. Brand on behalf of Nissan North America, Inc. (Brand, Walter)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Danielle I. Warlick shall be admitted pro hac vice to serve as co-counsel for the plaintiff John K. Hardy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on January 7, 2020. (Joffe, Scherry)
January 6, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Danielle I. Warlick to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4173308) by John K Hardy (Williams, Marcus)
January 6, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John K Hardy. Nissan North America, Inc. waiver sent on 12/11/2019, answer due 2/10/2020. (Williams, Marcus)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Nissan North America, Inc. (PG)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nissan North America, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4142846), filed by John K Hardy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Charge of Discrimination, #3 Exhibit B - Dismissal and Notice of Rights)(PG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hardy v. Nissan North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Represented By: Emily G. Barr
Represented By: Walter J. Brand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John K Hardy
Represented By: Marcus A. Williams
Represented By: Danielle I. Warlick - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?