Blackmon v. Hamilton
Plaintiff: James Carlos Blackmon
Defendant: Police Officer Cody Hamilton and Coty Hamilton
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 3:2019cv00843
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Tom S Lee
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cody Hamilton. Cody Hamilton waiver sent on 12/16/2019, answer due 2/14/2020. (Bland, Mallory)
January 8, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Mallory K. Bland on behalf of Cody Hamilton (Bland, Mallory)
January 8, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Todd Butler on behalf of Cody Hamilton (Butler, Gregory)
December 16, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Officer Cody Hamilton on 12/16/2019 by Cody Hamilton. Waiver of Service due by 1/16/2020. (LDR)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Clerk of Court is directed to issue a Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons for Defendant Hamilton. Defendant Hamilton is directed to file a signed Waiver form or a Response, within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 12/16/2019. [Copy mailed to plaintiff] (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons - Officer Cody Hamilton, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(LDR)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #5 , #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 12/12/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff and Sheriff or Authorized Officer of Inmate Accounts, Rankin County Jail] (CS)
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION in Support of Affidavit to proceed In Forma Pauperis re #5 RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by James Carlos Blackmon. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PG) Modified on 12/11/2019 (LAT).
December 11, 2019 Filing 6 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 as to #3 Order Opsp2,, Acknowledgement filed by James Carlos Blackmon. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PG)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by James Carlos Blackmon, re #4 ORDER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PG)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER, on or before December 23, 2019, plaintiff shall either pay the required filing fee or file a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 11/21/2019. [Copy mailed to plaintiff] (LDR)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 12/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 11/21/2019. [Copy mailed to plaintiff] (LDR)
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by James Carlos Blackmon. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PG)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cody Hamilton, filed by James Carlos Blackmon. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Assignment, #2 Envelope)(PG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackmon v. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Cody Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coty Hamilton
Represented By: Gregory Todd Butler
Represented By: Mallory K. Bland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Carlos Blackmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?