Havens v. Central Mississippi Correctional Facility et al
Plaintiff: Roger Wayne Havens
Defendant: N.P. R. King, Mississippi Department of Corrections, Ronald King, Captain Unknown Bates, Gloria Perry, Unknown Pierce, Central Mississippi Correctional Facility, N.P. A. Vyleta, N.P. N. Waltzer, Nurse Unknown Cee Cee, Lt. Unknown Burke, Captain Unknown Washington, D.W. Vivian Frazier, Unknown Robinson, Sandra Lampkin, Dr. William T. Brazier and Pelicia Hall
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 3:2019cv00870
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Response to Order re #9 ORDER that Central Mississippi Correctional Facility and the Mississippi Department of Corrections are Dismissed. Central Mississippi Correctional Facility and Mississippi Department of Corrections terminated. Signed by District Judge Henry T. Wingate on 1/12/20 (Copy mailed to Plaintiff)(MGB) filed by Roger Wayne Havens (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LAT)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that Central Mississippi Correctional Facility and the Mississippi Department of Corrections are Dismissed. Central Mississippi Correctional Facility and Mississippi Department of Corrections terminated. Signed by District Judge Henry T. Wingate on 1/12/20 (Copy mailed to Plaintiff)(MGB)
January 3, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Medical Administrator Sandra Lampkin, Dr. William T. Brazier, Nurse N. Waltzer, Nurse A. Vyleta, Nurse R. King, and Nurse Cee Cee on 01/03/2020. Waiver of Service due by 2/3/2020. (CS)
January 3, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Capt. Washington, Officer Robinson, Capt. Bates, Officer Pierce, Deputy Warden Vivian Frazier, Lt. Burke, Superintendent Ronald King, Dr. Gloria Perry and Commissioner Pelicia Hall on 01/03/2020. Waiver of Service due by 2/3/2020. (CS)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER, Clerk is directed to issue a Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons for all of the Defendants except Central Mississippi Correctional Facility and the Mississippi Department of Corrections. The Defendants are directed to file a signed Waiver form or a Response, within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 01/03/2020. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (Attachments: #1 Notice of Lawsuit-Washington, #2 Notice of Lawsuit-Medical Administrator, #3 Waiver of Service) (CS)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 01/03/2020. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff and Premier Supply Link for MDOC Inmate Accounts] (CS)
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 as to #3 Order Opsp2, Acknowledgement filed by Roger Wayne Havens. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LAT)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed to Plaintiff. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 1/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 12/02/2019. (CS)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Roger Wayne Havens. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LAT)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Unknown Bates, William T. Brazier, Unknown Burke, Unknown Cee Cee, Central Mississippi Correctional Facility, Vivian Frazier, Pelicia Hall, R. King, Ronald King, Sandra Lampkin, Mississippi Department of Corrections, Gloria Perry, Unknown Pierce, Unknown Robinson, A. Vyleta, N. Waltzer, Unknown Washington, filed by Roger Wayne Havens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A, #2 Exhibit -B, #3 Exhibit -C, #4 Exhibit -D, #5 Exhibit -E, #6 Exhibit -F, #7 Exhibit -G, #8 Exhibit -H, #9 Exhibit -I, #10 Exhibit -J, #11 Exhibit -K, #12 Exhibit -L, #13 Exhibit -M, #14 Exhibit -N, #15 Exhibit -O, #16 Exhibit -P, #17 Exhibit -Q, #18 Exhibit -R, #19 Exhibit -S, #20 Exhibit -T, #21 Exhibit -U, #22 Exhibit -V, #23 Cover Letter, #24 Envelope, #25 Notice of Assignment)(NEFs and notice of assignment mailed to Plaintiff's current address via USPS regular mail.)(LAT) Modified on 11/27/2019 (LAT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Havens v. Central Mississippi Correctional Facility et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N.P. R. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Unknown Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloria Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Mississippi Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N.P. A. Vyleta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N.P. N. Waltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Unknown Cee Cee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Unknown Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Unknown Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.W. Vivian Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Lampkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. William T. Brazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pelicia Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Wayne Havens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?