Kelly v. Wal-Mart Stores East , LP et al
Plaintiff: Sherry Kelly
Defendant: John Does 1-10, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP and Walmart Inc.; and
Case Number: 3:2019cv00873
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 2/13/2020 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 State Court Record by Defendants Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart Inc.; and (Smith, Dorissa)
December 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Louis on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart Inc.; and (Louis, Thomas)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart Inc.; and from Circuit Court of Madison County, Mississippi, case number CI 2019-0206-JR. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 05384151016) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Responses to RFA, #4 Exhibit C - Plaintiff's Notice of Service - Responses to RFA, #5 Exhibit D - Copies of process, pleadings, and orders served on WM)(PG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly v. Wal-Mart Stores East , LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Dorissa S. Smith
Represented By: Thomas M. Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.; and
Represented By: Dorissa S. Smith
Represented By: Thomas M. Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Kelly
Represented By: Martin R. Jelliffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?