Naylor v. Hyundai Capital America, Inc.,
Plaintiff: Martha Naylor
Defendant: Hyundai Capital America, Inc.,
Case Number: 3:2019cv00903
Filed: December 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Hyundai Capital America, Inc., answer due 2/19/2020. (dcw)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting Hyundai Capital America's Unopposed Motion #5 for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint. Hyundai Capital America Answer due 2/19/2020. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 1/30/2020. (dcw)
January 29, 2020 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Hyundai Capital America, Inc., (Hembree, George)
January 20, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Martha Naylor. Hyundai Capital America, Inc., served on 1/3/2020, answer due 1/24/2020. (Distasio - PHV, John)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That John C. Distasio be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of the plaintiff in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing as required by the Court. No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 12/17/2019. (JEJ)
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for John C. Distasio to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Martha Naylor (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Good Standing)(Wilkins, Robert)
December 12, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee paid for John C. Distasio receipt number 0538-4161948 $ 100 (Wilkins, Robert)
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Hyundai Capital America, Inc. (PG)
December 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hyundai Capital America, Inc., ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4158236), filed by Martha Naylor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(PG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Naylor v. Hyundai Capital America, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Naylor
Represented By: Robert F. Wilkins
Represented By: John C. Distasio - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Capital America, Inc.,
Represented By: George D. Hembree, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?