Dickey v. Delta Dental Plans Association et al
Plaintiff: Dr. William Dickey
Defendant: Delta Dental of Wisconsin, Delta Dental Plans Association, Delta Dental Plan of West Virginia, Inc., Delta Dental of the District of Columbia, Delta Dental of Puerto Rico, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of Oklahoma, Delta Dental of Colorado, Hawaii Dental Service, All Defendants, Delta Dental of Nebraska, Delta Dental Plan of New Hampshire, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of Idaho, Inc., Delta Dental of Virginia, Delta Dental of New York, Inc., DeltaUSA, Delta Dental of California, Delta Dental Plan of Vermont, Inc., Delta Dental of North Carolina, Delta Dental of Pennsylvania, Arizona Dental Insurance Service, Inc., Delta Dental of Iowa, Delta Dental of Illinois, Delta Dental Plan of Ohio, Inc., Delta Dental Insurance Company, Delta Dental of Missouri, Dental Service of Massachusetts, Inc., Delta Dental of Rhode Island, Delta Dental of Kansas, Inc., Delta Dental of Delaware, Inc., Oregon Dental Service, Delta Dental Plan of New Mexico, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of Michigan, Inc., Delta Dental of Minnesota, Delta Dental of New Jersey, Inc., Delta Dental of South Dakota, Delta Dental of Washington, Delta Dental Plan of Wyoming, Delta Dental Plan of Indiana, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of Arkansas, Inc., Maine Dental Service Corp., Delta Dental of Kentucky, Inc. and Delta Dental of Tennessee, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00910
Filed: December 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by William Dickey. Delta Dental Plan of Idaho, Inc. waiver sent on 1/30/2020, answer due 3/30/2020; Delta Dental Plan of Wyoming waiver sent on 1/30/2020, answer due 3/30/2020; Delta Dental Plans Association waiver sent on 1/30/2020, answer due 3/30/2020; Delta Dental of Minnesota waiver sent on 1/30/2020, answer due 3/30/2020; Delta Dental of Missouri waiver sent on 1/30/2020, answer due 3/30/2020; Delta Dental of Nebraska waiver sent on 1/30/2020, answer due 3/30/2020; Delta Dental of New Jersey, Inc. waiver sent on 1/30/2020, answer due 3/30/2020; Delta Dental of South Dakota waiver sent on 1/30/2020, answer due 3/30/2020; Delta Dental of Washington waiver sent on 1/30/2020, answer due 3/30/2020; DeltaUSA waiver sent on 1/30/2020, answer due 3/30/2020; Dental Service of Massachusetts, Inc. waiver sent on 1/30/2020, answer due 3/30/2020; Oregon Dental Service waiver sent on 1/30/2020, answer due 3/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Waiver of Service, #2 Attachment Waiver of Service, #3 Attachment Waiver of Service, #4 Attachment Waiver of Service, #5 Attachment Waiver of Service, #6 Attachment Waiver of Service, #7 Attachment Waiver of Service, #8 Attachment Waiver of Service, #9 Attachment Waiver of Service, #10 Attachment Waiver of Service, #11 Attachment Waiver of Service)(McGartland, Michael)
February 3, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by William Dickey. Delta Dental Plan of Arkansas, Inc. waiver sent on 1/30/2020, answer due 3/30/2020; Delta Dental Plan of Indiana, Inc. waiver sent on 1/30/2020, answer due 3/30/2020; Delta Dental Plan of Michigan, Inc. waiver sent on 1/30/2020, answer due 3/30/2020; Delta Dental Plan of New Mexico, Inc. waiver sent on 1/30/2020, answer due 3/30/2020; Delta Dental Plan of Ohio, Inc. waiver sent on 1/30/2020, answer due 3/30/2020; Delta Dental of Kentucky, Inc. waiver sent on 1/30/2020, answer due 3/30/2020; Delta Dental of North Carolina waiver sent on 1/30/2020, answer due 3/30/2020; Delta Dental of Tennessee, Inc. waiver sent on 1/30/2020, answer due 3/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Waiver of Service, #2 Attachment Waiver of Service, #3 Attachment Waiver of Service, #4 Attachment Waiver of Service, #5 Attachment Waiver of Service, #6 Attachment Waiver of Service, #7 Attachment Waiver of Service)(McGartland, Michael)
January 31, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by William Dickey. Arizona Dental Insurance Service, Inc. waiver sent on 1/30/2020, answer due 3/30/2020; Delta Dental Plan of New Hampshire, Inc. waiver sent on 1/30/2020, answer due 3/30/2020; Delta Dental Plan of Oklahoma waiver sent on 1/30/2020, answer due 3/30/2020; Delta Dental Plan of Vermont, Inc. waiver sent on 1/30/2020, answer due 3/30/2020; Delta Dental of Colorado waiver sent on 1/30/2020, answer due 3/30/2020; Delta Dental of Illinois waiver sent on 1/30/2020, answer due 3/30/2020; Delta Dental of Iowa waiver sent on 1/30/2020, answer due 3/30/2020; Delta Dental of Kansas, Inc. waiver sent on 1/30/2020, answer due 3/30/2020; Delta Dental of Rhode Island waiver sent on 1/30/2020, answer due 3/30/2020; Delta Dental of Virginia waiver sent on 1/30/2020, answer due 3/30/2020; Hawaii Dental Service waiver sent on 1/30/2020, answer due 3/30/2020; Maine Dental Service Corp. waiver sent on 1/30/2020, answer due 3/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Waiver of Service for Delta Illinois, #2 Attachment Waiver of Service for Virginia, #3 Attachment Waiver of Service for Arizona Dental Insurance Service, Inc., #4 Attachment Waiver of Service for Delta Dental of Iowa, #5 Attachment Waiver of Service for Delta Dental of Kansas Inc., #6 Attachment Waiver of Service for Delta Dental of Rhode Island, #7 Attachment Waiver of Service for Delta Dental Plan of New Hampshire Inc., #8 Attachment Waiver of Service for Delta Dental Plan of Oklahoma, #9 Attachment Waiver of Service for Delta Dental Plan of Vermont Inc., #10 Attachment Waiver of Service for Hawaii Dental Service, #11 Attachment Waiver of Service for Maine Dental Service Corporation)(McGartland, Michael)
January 30, 2020 Filing 4 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Regarding Time To Respond to Class Action Complaint and Stay of Proceedings (Joint) by All Defendants (Dollarhide, John)
January 2, 2020 Filing 3 Letter sent to MDL Clerk, Mr. John W. Nichols with a copy of docket sheet, as well as a copy of the complaint. (LAT)
December 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (LAT)
December 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4159605), filed by William Dickey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dickey v. Delta Dental Plans Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Wisconsin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plans Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plan of West Virginia, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of the District of Columbia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Puerto Rico, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plan of Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaii Dental Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plan of New Hampshire, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plan of Idaho, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of New York, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeltaUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plan of Vermont, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of North Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Dental Insurance Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Iowa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plan of Ohio, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dental Service of Massachusetts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Rhode Island
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Kansas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Delaware, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon Dental Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plan of New Mexico, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plan of Michigan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Minnesota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of New Jersey, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of South Dakota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plan of Wyoming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plan of Indiana, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plan of Arkansas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maine Dental Service Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Kentucky, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Tennessee, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. William Dickey
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?