Nichols v. Smith
Appellant: Tracy Lynn Nichols
Appellee: Stephen Smith and Derek A. Henderson
Interested Party: U.S. Bankruptcy Court-Jackson and U.S. Trustee
Case Number: 3:2019cv00917
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal filed by Tracy Lynn Nichols. (VM)
January 28, 2020 Filing 4 Letter from Tracy Lynn Nichols. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (VM)
January 20, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal by Derek A. Henderson (Henderson, Derek)
January 13, 2020 Filing 2 Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, (Attachments: #1 Docket Entries, #2 Notice of Appeal, #3 Clerk's Certificate, #4 Transmittal Letter)(VM)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-01269-NPO. File received The docketing of the record on appeal by USDC starts the briefing schedule. Attorneys should refer to Bankruptcy Rule 8018 for all briefing schedules., filed by Tracy Lynn Nichols. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Clerk's Notice of Appeal, #3 Transmittal Letter)(VM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nichols v. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Tracy Lynn Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Stephen Smith
Represented By: Derek A. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Derek A. Henderson
Represented By: Derek A. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U.S. Bankruptcy Court-Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U.S. Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?