Powell v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Undra Powell
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA General Counsel
Case Number: 3:2019cv00918
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Robert H Walker
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case Commissioner of Social Security served on 2/6/2020, answer due 5/6/2020. Service made upon: U S Attorney; (PG)
January 8, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, SSA General Counsel, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (LAT) (Main Document 7 replaced on 1/8/2020) (LAT).
January 8, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #5 : Modified text to show linkage to #2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (LAT)
January 8, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #4 : Document inadvertently filed in error. (LAT)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; advising Plaintiff re: service of process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on January 6, 2020. (Joffe, Scherry)
December 27, 2019 Filing 5 ATTACHMENT re #2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Undra Powell (Ketcherside, John) Modified on 1/8/2020 (LAT).
December 26, 2019 Filing 4 ***ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY.***ATTACHMENT #2 Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, by Undra Powell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PG) Modified on 1/8/2020 (LAT).
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER: On or before 12/31/2019, Plaintiff shall complete and file the Long Form Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. The completed and executed Long Form shall be filed with the Clerk as an attachment to #2 Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on December 17, 2019. (Joffe, Scherry) Modified on 12/17/2019 (Joffe, Scherry) to indicate this is a text only order.
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER establishing briefing schedule, setting out briefing requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on December 17, 2019. (Joffe, Scherry)
December 16, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Undra Powell. (PG)
December 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Undra Powell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(PG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powell v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Undra Powell
Represented By: John F. Ketcherside
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?