Williams v. Canton Public School District et al
Plaintiff: Cassandra Williams
Defendant: Andrew Grant, Les Penn, Erik Gilkey, Moses Thompson, Daphne Sims, Fred Esco, Jr., Courtney Rainey, Shivochie Dinkins, Lisa Ross, Canton Public School District and Timothy Taylor
Case Number: 3:2019cv00927
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2020 Filing 56 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #39 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 9(b) and 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Lisa Ross by Cassandra Williams (Christopher, John)
February 14, 2020 Filing 55 MEMORANDUM in Support re #54 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Timothy Taylor (Gibbs, Robert)
February 14, 2020 Filing 54 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Timothy Taylor (Gibbs, Robert)
February 14, 2020 Filing 53 Response in Support re #52 Joinder in Document by Canton Public School District to #51 Rebuttal re #32 Motion to Disqualify Counsel filed by Lisa Ross (Lloyd, Erica) Modified on 2/13/2020 (KNS)., #32 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff by Lisa Ross (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - 7/18/18 Hearing Transcript)(Welch, James) filed by Shivochie Dinkins (Merritt, LaToya)
February 13, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #52 : Court staff linked document to original motion. (KNS)
February 13, 2020 Filing 52 Joinder in Document by Canton Public School District to #51 Rebuttal re #32 Motion to Disqualify Counsel filed by Lisa Ross (Lloyd, Erica) Modified on 2/13/2020 (KNS).
February 13, 2020 Filing 51 Rebuttal re #32 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff filed by Lisa Ross (Welch, James)
February 12, 2020 Filing 50 Response in Opposition re #38 Joinder in Document by Shivochie Dinkins to #32 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff filed by Lisa Ross (Merritt, LaToya) filed by Cassandra Williams (Christopher, John)
February 12, 2020 Filing 49 Response in Opposition re #37 Joinder in Document by Moses Thompson to #32 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff filed by Lisa Ross (Williams, Michael) filed by Cassandra Williams (Christopher, John)
February 11, 2020 Filing 48 RESPONSE in Support re #28 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Moses Thompson (Webster, Clarence)
February 6, 2020 Filing 47 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #32 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff filed by Cassandra Williams (Christopher, John)
February 6, 2020 Filing 46 RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff filed by Cassandra Williams (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Affidavit of John W. Christopher)(Christopher, John)
February 6, 2020 Filing 45 MEMORANDUM in Support re #44 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Shivochie Dinkins (Merritt, LaToya)
February 6, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Shivochie Dinkins (Merritt, LaToya)
February 5, 2020 Filing 43 Summons Issued as to Courtney Rainey. (VM)
February 4, 2020 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #28 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Moses Thompson filed by Cassandra Williams (Christopher, John)
February 4, 2020 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re #28 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Cassandra Williams (Christopher, John)
February 4, 2020 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM in Support re #39 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 9(b) and 12(b)(6) filed by Lisa Ross (Welch, James)
February 4, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 9(b) and 12(b)(6) by Lisa Ross (Welch, James)
January 30, 2020 Filing 38 Joinder in Document by Shivochie Dinkins to #32 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff filed by Lisa Ross (Merritt, LaToya)
January 29, 2020 Filing 37 Joinder in Document by Moses Thompson to #32 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff filed by Lisa Ross (Williams, Michael)
January 28, 2020 Filing 36 Joinder in Document by Canton Public School District to #32 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff filed by Lisa Ross (Lloyd, Erica)
January 28, 2020 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Canton Public School District (Lloyd, Erica)
January 28, 2020 Filing 34 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 3/25/2020 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ)
January 24, 2020 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM in Support re #32 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff filed by Lisa Ross (Welch, James)
January 24, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff by Lisa Ross (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 7/18/18 Hearing Transcript)(Welch, James)
January 23, 2020 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Cassandra Williams (Christopher, John)
January 23, 2020 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Cassandra Williams (Christopher, John)
January 21, 2020 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM in Support re #28 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Moses Thompson (Webster, Clarence)
January 21, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss by Moses Thompson (Webster, Clarence)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting unopposed Motion #24 to Withdraw as Attorney for Courtney Rainey and granting unopposed Motion #26 to Withdraw as Attorney for Timothy Taylor. Attorney Christy Vinson Malatesta terminated. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 1/13/2020. (dcw)
January 10, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric C Tanner on behalf of Courtney Rainey (Tanner, Eric)
January 10, 2020 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Timothy Taylor (Malatesta, Christy)
January 10, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert L. Gibbs on behalf of Timothy Taylor (Gibbs, Robert)
January 10, 2020 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Courtney Rainey (Malatesta, Christy)
January 10, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Candice L. Rucker on behalf of Shivochie Dinkins (Rucker, Candice)
January 9, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by E. Carlos Tanner, III on behalf of Courtney Rainey (Tanner, E.)
January 9, 2020 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support re #20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Canton Public School District (Lloyd, Erica)
January 9, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss by Canton Public School District (Lloyd, Erica)
January 9, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Canton Public School District.(Lloyd, Erica)
January 8, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael C. Williams on behalf of Moses Thompson (Williams, Michael)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Shivochie Dinkins answer due 2/7/2020. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 1/8/2020. (dcw)
January 8, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, Exh A - Plaintiff's Complaint by Shivochie Dinkins (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email to Plaintiff's Counsel)(Merritt, LaToya)
January 8, 2020 Filing 16 Joinder in Document by Shivochie Dinkins to #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Lisa Ross, Canton Public School District (Merritt, LaToya)
January 7, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process filed by Courtney Rainey (Malatesta, Christy)
January 7, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process by Courtney Rainey (Malatesta, Christy)
January 7, 2020 Filing 13 Joinder in Document by Courtney Rainey to #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Lisa Ross, Canton Public School District (Malatesta, Christy)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting Motion #12 for Extension of Time to Answer. Moses Thompson answer due 1/21/2020. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 1/6/2020. (dcw)
January 3, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Moses Thompson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Electronic-Mail Correspondence))(Webster, Clarence)
January 3, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Clarence Webster, III on behalf of Moses Thompson (Webster, Clarence)
January 3, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Lisa Ross.(Welch, James)
January 2, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Daphne Sims.(Banks, Kimberly)
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Fred Esco, Jr, Erik Gilkey, Andrew Grant, Les Penn.(Banks, Kimberly)
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 Joinder in Document by Moses Thompson to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Lisa Ross, Canton Public School District. (VM)
January 2, 2020 Filing 6 Joinder in Document by Daphne Sims to #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Lisa Ross, Canton Public School District (Banks, Kimberly)
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 Joinder in Document by Fred Esco, Jr, Erik Gilkey, Andrew Grant, Les Penn to #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Lisa Ross, Canton Public School District (Banks, Kimberly)
January 2, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Timothy Taylor (Malatesta, Christy)
January 2, 2020 Filing 3 Joinder in Document by Timothy Taylor to #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Lisa Ross, Canton Public School District (Malatesta, Christy)
December 26, 2019 Filing 2 State Court Record by Defendant Canton Public School District (Atkins, Jay)
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Canton Public School District, Lisa Ross from Circuit - Madison, case number 19-269. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4167608) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complaint, #2 Exhibit B Notice of Filing, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(cwl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Canton Public School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Grant
Represented By: Kimberly C. Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Les Penn
Represented By: Kimberly C. Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik Gilkey
Represented By: Kimberly C. Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moses Thompson
Represented By: Michael C. Williams
Represented By: Clarence Webster, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daphne Sims
Represented By: Kimberly C. Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Esco, Jr.
Represented By: Kimberly C. Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney Rainey
Represented By: E. Carlos Tanner, III
Represented By: Eric C Tanner
Represented By: Christy Vinson Malatesta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shivochie Dinkins
Represented By: LaToya C. Merritt
Represented By: Candice L. Rucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Ross
Represented By: James E. Welch, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canton Public School District
Represented By: Jay Marshall Atkins
Represented By: Erica Jo Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Taylor
Represented By: Robert L. Gibbs
Represented By: Christy Vinson Malatesta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandra Williams
Represented By: John W. Christopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?