Mills v. Trustmark National Bank et al
Plaintiff: Alysson Mills
Defendant: RiverHills Bank, Southern Bancorp Bank, Trustmark National Bank, Jud Watkins and Bennie Butts
Receiver: Alysson Leigh Mills
Case Number: 3:2019cv00941
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2020 Filing 23 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 3/26/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ)
February 20, 2020 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Bennie Butts (Bailey, Cody)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting unopposed Motion #21 for Extension of Time to Answer. Trustmark National Bank answer due 3/12/2020. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 2/20/2020. (dcw)
February 19, 2020 Filing 21 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Trustmark National Bank (Ray, William)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting unopposed Motion #20 for Extension of Time to Answer filed by Defendant Jud Watkins. Jud Watkins answer due 3/9/2020. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 2/5/2020. (dcw)
February 4, 2020 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Jud Watkins (Simpkins, Kelly)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting unopposed Motion #19 for Extension of Time to Answer. Southern Bancorp Bank answer due 3/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 1/31/2020. (dcw)
January 30, 2020 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint by Southern Bancorp Bank (Griffin, Adam)
January 29, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly D. Simpkins on behalf of Jud Watkins (Simpkins, Kelly)
January 29, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Walter D. Willson on behalf of Jud Watkins (Willson, Walter)
January 22, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alysson Mills. Southern Bancorp Bank served on 1/21/2020, answer due 2/11/2020. (Bass, Lilli)
January 17, 2020 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Southern Bancorp Bank. (LAT)
January 15, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alysson Mills. Jud Watkins served on 1/14/2020, answer due 2/4/2020. (Bass, Lilli)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Brent B. Barriere, Kristen D. Amond and Rebekka C. Veith be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of the plaintiff in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing as required by the Court. No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 1/15/2020. (JEJ)
January 13, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly D. Simpkins on behalf of RiverHills Bank (Simpkins, Kelly)
January 13, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Walter D. Willson on behalf of RiverHills Bank (Willson, Walter)
January 13, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Jud Watkins. (PKM)
January 10, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Alysson Mills. Bennie Butts waiver sent on 1/10/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. (Bass, Lilli)
January 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Cody C. Bailey on behalf of Bennie Butts (Bailey, Cody)
January 10, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by R. David Kaufman on behalf of Bennie Butts (Kaufman, R.)
January 10, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Alysson Mills. RiverHills Bank waiver sent on 1/9/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. (Bass, Lilli)
January 7, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Alysson Mills. Trustmark National Bank waiver sent on 1/2/2020, answer due 3/2/2020. (Bass, Lilli)
January 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by William F. Ray on behalf of Trustmark National Bank (Ray, William)
December 31, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Rebekka C. Veith to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alysson Mills (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Appendix Order Waiving Fee)(Bass, Lilli)
December 31, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Kristen D. Amond to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alysson Mills (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Appendix Order Waiving Fee)(Bass, Lilli)
December 31, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Brent B. Barriere to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alysson Mills (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Appendix Order Waiving Fee)(Bass, Lilli)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Bennie Butts, RiverHills Bank, Southern Bancorp Bank, Trustmark National Bank, Jud Watkins ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4170919), filed by Alysson Mills. (Attachments: #1 Appendix - Notice of Relatedness, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mills v. Trustmark National Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RiverHills Bank
Represented By: Kelly D. Simpkins
Represented By: Walter D. Willson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Bancorp Bank
Represented By: Adam V. Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustmark National Bank
Represented By: William F. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jud Watkins
Represented By: Kelly D. Simpkins
Represented By: Walter D. Willson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bennie Butts
Represented By: R. David Kaufman
Represented By: Cody C. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alysson Mills
Represented By: Lilli Evans Bass
Represented By: Kristen D. Amond - PHV
Represented By: Brent B. Barriere - PHV
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Alysson Leigh Mills
Represented By: Alysson Leigh Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?