Manuel v. Jackson HMA, LLC
Plaintiff: President Manuel
Defendant: Jackson HMA, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00065
Filed: January 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF Receipt by Circuit Clerk of Hinds County received on February 6, 2020. (MGB)
February 4, 2020 Filing 3 Letter from Arthur Johnston, Clerk to Hon. Zack Wallace transmitting certified copies of Order of Remand and Docket Sheet. (KNS)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF REMAND. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 02/04/2020 (KNS)
January 31, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jackson HMA, LLC from Circuit - Hinds, case number 1-19cv5132. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4197926) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 County Court Civil Cover Sheet, #3 County Court Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet(cwl) Modified on 1/31/2020 (cwl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manuel v. Jackson HMA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson HMA, LLC
Represented By: Stephen P. Kruger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: President Manuel
Represented By: Rodgrick G. Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?