Johnson vs. Bailey
Plaintiff: Carvis Lamar Johnson
Defendant: Sheriff Bryant Bailey
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 3:2020cv00117
Filed: February 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, on or before May 4, 2020, pro se Plaintiff Carvis Lamar Johnson shall either pay the $350 filing and $50 administrative fees; file a properly completed ifp; or file a written response consistent with this Order. Show Cause Response due by 5/4/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 04/20/2020. [Copy of Order and [Dkt. 8, p. 2] mailed to Plaintiff] (CS)
March 20, 2020 Filing 8 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis in re #4 Order by Carvis Lamar Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(VM)
March 17, 2020 Filing 7 Letter from Carvis Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (VM) Modified on 3/17/2020 (VM).
March 13, 2020 Filing 6 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Carvis Lamar Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(VM)
March 13, 2020 Filing 5 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 as to #3 Order Opsp2, Acknowledgement filed by Carvis Lamar Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(VM)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The plaintiff shall file within 30 days of the date of this order a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 03/04/2020. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed to Plaintiff. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 4/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 03/04/2020. (CS)
February 28, 2020 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Carvis Lamar Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(VM)
February 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bryant Bailey, filed by Carvis Lamar Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope, #3 Notice of Assignment)(VM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson vs. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carvis Lamar Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Bryant Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?