Bryan v. McLarty MBN, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Carolyn P. Bryan
Defendant: Mark S. Longgrear, Herrin-Gear Chevrolet Co., Inc., Gateway One Lending & Finance, LLC, Zachary Longgrear, McLarty MBN, LLC, Herrin-Gear Infiniti, Inc., Herrin-Gear Imports, Inc., Herrin-Gear Toyota, Herrin-Gear Automotive, Inc. and Herrin-Gear, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00122
Filed: February 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2020 Filing 20 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 6/26/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ)
April 13, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Settlement by Gateway One Lending & Finance, LLC (Leeth, Alan)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Gateway One Lending & Finance, LLC answer due 4/14/2020. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 4/6/2020. (dcw)
March 30, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand (with Defenses) by Herrin-Gear Automotive, Inc., Herrin-Gear Chevrolet Co., Inc., Herrin-Gear Imports, Inc., Herrin-Gear Infiniti, Inc..(Kelly, Michael)
March 26, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #16 : Court staff noticed an error in docket text, Attorney has refiled document as #17 . (LAT)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting unopposed Motion #17 for Extension of Time to Answer. McLarty MBN, LLC answer due 4/3/2020. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 3/26/2020. (dcw)
March 25, 2020 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by McLarty MBN, LLC (Manor, Wade)
March 25, 2020 Filing 16 ***ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY.***MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by McLarty MBN, LLC (Manor, Wade) Modified on 3/26/2020 (LAT).
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting Unopposed Motion #15 for Extension of Time to Answer. Herrin-Gear Automotive, Inc. answer due 3/31/2020; Herrin-Gear Chevrolet Co., Inc. answer due 3/31/2020; Herrin-Gear Imports, Inc. answer due 3/31/2020; Herrin-Gear Infiniti, Inc. answer due 3/31/2020. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 3/25/2020. (dcw)
March 24, 2020 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Herrin-Gear Automotive, Inc., Herrin-Gear Chevrolet Co., Inc., Herrin-Gear Imports, Inc., Herrin-Gear Infiniti, Inc. (Hazard, J.)
March 24, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand (with Defenses) by Herrin-Gear Toyota, Herrin-Gear, Inc..(Kelly, Michael)
March 19, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carolyn P. Bryan. Mark S. Longgrear served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020. (Roberts, Lindsay)
March 19, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Gateway One Lending & Finance, LLC (Leeth, Alan)
March 17, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Wade G. Manor on behalf of McLarty MBN, LLC (Manor, Wade)
March 11, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carolyn P. Bryan. Herrin-Gear, Inc. served on 3/3/2020, answer due 3/24/2020. (Roberts, Lindsay)
March 11, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carolyn P. Bryan. Herrin-Gear Infiniti, Inc. served on 3/3/2020, answer due 3/24/2020. (Roberts, Lindsay)
March 11, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carolyn P. Bryan. Herrin-Gear Imports, Inc. served on 3/3/2020, answer due 3/24/2020. (Roberts, Lindsay)
March 11, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carolyn P. Bryan. Herrin-Gear Automotive, Inc. served on 3/3/2020, answer due 3/24/2020. (Roberts, Lindsay)
March 11, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carolyn P. Bryan. Herrin-Gear Chevrolet Co., Inc. served on 3/3/2020, answer due 3/24/2020. (Roberts, Lindsay)
March 11, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carolyn P. Bryan. Herrin-Gear Toyota served on 3/3/2020, answer due 3/24/2020. (Roberts, Lindsay)
March 11, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carolyn P. Bryan. Gateway One Lending & Finance, LLC served on 3/3/2020, answer due 3/24/2020. (Roberts, Lindsay)
March 11, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carolyn P. Bryan. McLarty MBN, LLC served on 3/3/2020, answer due 3/24/2020. (Roberts, Lindsay)
March 2, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Gateway One Lending & Finance, LLC, Herrin-Gear Automotive, Inc., Herrin-Gear Chevrolet Co., Inc., Herrin-Gear Imports, Inc., Herrin-Gear Infiniti, Inc., Herrin-Gear Toyota, Herrin-Gear, Inc., Mark S. Longgrear, Zachary Longgrear and McLarty MBN, LLC. (ND)
February 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND APPICATION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Gateway One Lending & Finance, LLC, Herrin-Gear Automotive, Inc., Herrin-Gear Chevrolet Co., Inc., Herrin-Gear Imports, Inc., Herrin-Gear Infiniti, Inc., Herrin-Gear Toyota, Herrin-Gear, Inc., Mark S. Longgrear, Zachary Longgrear, McLarty MBN, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4220394), filed by Carolyn P. Bryan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Retail Installment Sale Contract, #2 Exhibit B - Application for Certificate of Title, #3 Exhibit C - Odometer Disclosure Statement, #4 Exhibit D - Carfax Vehicle History Report, #5 Exhibit E - Affidavit for Probable for A Complaint and Arrest Warrant, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryan v. McLarty MBN, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark S. Longgrear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herrin-Gear Chevrolet Co., Inc.
Represented By: J. Wyatt Hazard
Represented By: Michael R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gateway One Lending & Finance, LLC
Represented By: Alan Daniel Leeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary Longgrear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McLarty MBN, LLC
Represented By: Wade G. Manor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herrin-Gear Infiniti, Inc.
Represented By: J. Wyatt Hazard
Represented By: Michael R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herrin-Gear Imports, Inc.
Represented By: J. Wyatt Hazard
Represented By: Michael R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herrin-Gear Toyota
Represented By: Michael R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herrin-Gear Automotive, Inc.
Represented By: J. Wyatt Hazard
Represented By: Michael R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herrin-Gear, Inc.
Represented By: Michael R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn P. Bryan
Represented By: Lindsay K. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?