Horne v. Hackbarth Delivery Service, Inc.
Plaintiff: Thoreasa Horne
Defendant: Hackbarth Delivery Service, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00251
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2020 Filing 9 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 8/7/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ)
May 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Martin J. Regimbal on behalf of Hackbarth Delivery Service, Inc. (Regimbal, Martin)
May 26, 2020 Filing 7 DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Hackbarth Delivery Service, Inc..(Reese, Kelly)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Ryan Morgan be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of the plaintiff in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing as required by the Court. No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 5/13/2020. (JEJ)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting Unopposed Motion #6 for Extension of Time to Answer. Hackbarth Delivery Service, Inc. answer due 5/26/2020. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 5/11/2020. (dcw)
May 8, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #6 . Proposed orders are not to be electronically filed as a separate pleading or as an attachment to a pleading, but instead are to be provided to chambers by e-mail (Court's Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Sec.5.B.). (ND)
May 8, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Hackbarth Delivery Service, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Reese, Kelly)
May 8, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Ryan Morgan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4270642) by Thoreasa Horne (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Jelliffe, Martin)
May 5, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thoreasa Horne. Hackbarth Delivery Service, Inc. served on 4/21/2020, answer due 5/12/2020. (Jelliffe, Martin)
April 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing of Consents to Join by Thoreasa Horne re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CTJ for Alfred Dixon, #2 Exhibit B - CTJ for Willie White, #3 Exhibit C - CTJ for Harvey Marshall, #4 Exhibit D - CTJ for Jacqueline Lewis, #5 Exhibit E - CTJ for Cantina Jackson, #6 Exhibit F - CTJ for Willie Nelson, #7 Exhibit G - CTJ for Thoreausa Horne)(Jelliffe, Martin)
April 9, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Hackbarth Delivery Service, Inc. (LAT)
April 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Hackbarth Delivery Service, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4249923), filed by Thoreasa Horne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Mission Statement, #2 Exhibit B - Locations, #3 Exhibit C - Last Mile Delivery, #4 Exhibit D - Delivering Connectivity, #5 Exhibit E - Sign re Stops, #6 Exhibit F - Sign re Badge and Hackbarth Shirt, #7 Exhibit G - Email, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horne v. Hackbarth Delivery Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thoreasa Horne
Represented By: Martin R. Jelliffe
Represented By: C. Ryan Morgan - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hackbarth Delivery Service, Inc.
Represented By: Martin J. Regimbal
Represented By: Kelly D. Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?