City of Jackson, Mississippi v. Jaxon Energy, LLC et al
Plaintiff: City of Jackson, Mississippi
Defendant: Jaxon Energy, LLC, Zachary D. Kent, Smitty's Supply, Inc., Emerald Partners, LLC, Jason Hensley, Edgar Ray Smith, III and Chad E. Tate
Case Number: 3:2020cv00280
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2020 Filing 11 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 7/23/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah)
June 18, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Jason Hensley, Zachary D. Kent, Edgar Ray Smith, III, Chad E. Tate.(Bell, Lewis)
June 18, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Emerald Partners, LLC, Smitty's Supply, Inc..(Bell, Lewis)
June 18, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Jaxon Energy, LLC.(Bell, Lewis)
May 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert H. Pedersen on behalf of All Defendants (Pedersen, Robert)
May 22, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Lewis W. Bell on behalf of Emerald Partners, LLC, Jason Hensley, Jaxon Energy, LLC, Zachary D. Kent, Edgar Ray Smith, III, Smitty's Supply, Inc., Chad E. Tate (Bell, Lewis)
May 21, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by City of Jackson, Mississippi. Emerald Partners, LLC waiver sent on 5/15/2020, answer due 7/14/2020; Jason Hensley waiver sent on 5/15/2020, answer due 7/14/2020; Jaxon Energy, LLC waiver sent on 5/15/2020, answer due 7/14/2020; Zachary D. Kent waiver sent on 5/15/2020, answer due 7/14/2020; Edgar Ray Smith, III waiver sent on 5/15/2020, answer due 7/14/2020; Smitty's Supply, Inc. waiver sent on 5/15/2020, answer due 7/14/2020; Chad E. Tate waiver sent on 5/15/2020, answer due 7/14/2020. (Quin, William)
May 13, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Jackson, Mississippi. Jaxon Energy, LLC served on 5/12/2020, answer due 6/2/2020. (Quin, William)
May 13, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Jackson, Mississippi. Smitty's Supply, Inc. served on 5/13/2020, answer due 6/3/2020. (Quin, William)
April 24, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Emerald Partners, LLC, Jason Hensley, Jaxon Energy, LLC, Zachary D. Kent, Edgar Ray Smith, III, Smitty's Supply, Inc., Chad E. Tate. (LAT)
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 ORIGINAL COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Emerald Partners, LLC, Jason Hensley, Jaxon Energy, LLC, Zachary D. Kent, Edgar Ray Smith, III, Smitty's Supply, Inc., Chad E. Tate ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4259325), filed by City of Jackson, Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Payment and Receipt, #2 Exhibit 2-Text Messages, #3 Exhibit 3-Email, #4 Exhibit 4-Employees FAC, #5 Exhibit 5-MDEQ Correspondence, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Jackson, Mississippi v. Jaxon Energy, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaxon Energy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary D. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smitty's Supply, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emerald Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Hensley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgar Ray Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad E. Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Jackson, Mississippi
Represented By: William M. Quin, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?