Attkisson v. Jackson HMA, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Attkisson
Defendant: Jackson HMA, LLC and John Does 1-5
Case Number: 3:2020cv00301
Filed: April 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 RESET Hearing: Telephonic Case Management Conference reset for 7/24/2020 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. (JEJ)
June 22, 2020 RESET Hearing: Telephonic Case Management Conference reset for 7/1/2020 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. (JEJ)
June 15, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Service of Disclosure by Timothy Attkisson (Reeves, John)
June 15, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Timothy Attkisson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Reeves, John)
June 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by Jackson HMA, LLC (Boykin, Thurman)
May 8, 2020 Filing 5 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 6/23/2020 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ)
April 29, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jackson HMA, LLC (Boykin, Thurman)
April 29, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Thurman L. Boykin, III on behalf of Jackson HMA, LLC (Boykin, Thurman)
April 29, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Jackson HMA, LLC.(Kruger, Stephen)
April 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with JURY DEMAND by Jackson HMA, LLC from Hinds County Circuit Court, MS, case number 20-197. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4263093) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2- State Court File, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Attkisson v. Jackson HMA, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson HMA, LLC
Represented By: Stephen P. Kruger
Represented By: Thurman L. Boykin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Attkisson
Represented By: John Raymond Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?