Parker v. Smith Rouchon & Associates Inc.
Plaintiff: Kerlisa Parker
Defendant: Smith Rouchon & Associates Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00405
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2020 Filing 15 Letter sent to Charles Hammond, Esq. and William Keith Wier, Esq. on 6/18/2020 requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (LAT) Modified on 6/18/2020 (LAT).
June 18, 2020 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00716. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to Southern District of Mississippi.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/18/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 6/18/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Charles Eskridge, filed. (jengonzalez, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/18/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING and DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 08/31/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 07/02/2020. Plaintiff Expert Report due by 02/26/2021. Deft Expert Report due by 03/26/2021. Discovery due by 05/07/2021. Mediation due by 07/16/2021. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 06/04/2021. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 06/04/2021. Joint Pretrial Order due by 08/13/2021. Docket Call set for 09/27/2021 at 9:30 AM before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified. (jengonzalezadi) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/18/2020.] (Entered: 06/02/2020)
May 28, 2020 Filing 10 Agreed RESPONSE to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Kerlisa Parker. (Hammond, Charles) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/18/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Smith Rouchon & Associates Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Wier, William) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/18/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Smith Rouchon & Associates Inc. served on 4/10/2020, answer due 5/1/2020, filed.(Hammond, Charles) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/18/2020.]
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to file answer. Smith Rouchon & Associates must file its responsive pleading by 05/06/2020.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/18/2020.]
April 13, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to file answer by Smith Rouchon & Associates Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wier, William) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/18/2020.]
April 1, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Kerlisa Parker, filed.(Hammond, Charles) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/18/2020.]
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/4/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8B before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalezadi, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/18/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Smith Rouchon & Associates Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/18/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Smith Rouchon & Associates Inc., filed.(Hammond, Charles) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/18/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Smith Rouchon & Associates Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24288735) filed by Kerlisa Parker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hammond, Charles) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/18/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Smith Rouchon & Associates Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Rouchon & Associates Inc.
Represented By: William Keith Wier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerlisa Parker
Represented By: Charles Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?