Wesco Insurance Company v. State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Wesco Insurance Company
Defendant: Houston Specialty Insurance Company, Sera Wragg, Jeffrey Pruitt, State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company, B&G Wood, Inc., B&G Transport, Inc. and Jerome Rash
Case Number: 3:2020cv00422
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wesco Insurance Company (Ott, David)
August 6, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Houston Specialty Insurance Company (Ellzey, Scott)
August 6, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, and Affirmative Defenses by Houston Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - HSIC Policy)(Ellzey, Scott)
July 31, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Drury Sumner Holland on behalf of Houston Specialty Insurance Company (Holland, Drury)
July 31, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Timothy Ellzey on behalf of Houston Specialty Insurance Company (Ellzey, Scott)
July 27, 2020 Filing 10 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 8/28/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah)
July 24, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Jerome Rash, Sera Wragg.(Rogers, R.)
July 24, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by B&G Transport, Inc., B&G Wood, Inc., Jeffrey Pruitt.(Jordan, Terry)
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company. State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company waiver sent on 6/30/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (Tominello, Andrew)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew F. Tominello on behalf of State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Tominello, Andrew)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Ryan Perkins on behalf of State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Perkins, J. Ryan)
July 6, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wesco Insurance Company. State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company served on 6/30/2020, answer due 7/21/2020. (Ott, David)
July 6, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wesco Insurance Company. Houston Specialty Insurance Company served on 6/30/2020, answer due 7/21/2020. (Ott, David)
June 26, 2020 Filing 2 Summonses Issued as to B&G Transport, Inc., B&G Wood, Inc., Houston Specialty Insurance Company, Jeffrey Pruitt, Jerome Rash, State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company and Sera Wragg. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Houston Specialty, #2 Summons - Pruitt, #3 Summons - Rash, #4 Summons - State Auto, #5 Summons - Wragg, #6 Summons - B&G Wood)(ND)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against B&G Transport, Inc., B&G Wood, Inc., Houston Specialty Insurance Company, Jeffrey Pruitt, Jerome Rash, State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company and Sera Wragg ( Filing fee $ 400 paid; receipt number 0538-4306702), filed by Wesco Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - AffidavIt of Donald Grantham, #2 Exhibit B - Endorsement, #3 Exhibit C - Wesco Insurance Policy part 1, #4 Exhibit C - Wesco Insurance Policy part 2, #5 Exhibit D - State Auto Insurance Policy, #6 Exhibit E - Houston Specialty Insurance Policy, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wesco Insurance Company v. State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houston Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Drury Sumner Holland
Represented By: Scott Timothy Ellzey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sera Wragg
Represented By: R. Gregg Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Pruitt
Represented By: Terry L. Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: J. Ryan Perkins
Represented By: Andrew F. Tominello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B&G Wood, Inc.
Represented By: Terry L. Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B&G Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Terry L. Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerome Rash
Represented By: R. Gregg Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesco Insurance Company
Represented By: David M. Ott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?