Mills v. Anderson et al
Plaintiff: Alysson Mills
Defendant: Shell Investments, LLC, James R. Shell and Stuart Anderson
Case Number: 3:2020cv00427
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Kristen D. Amond and Brent B. Barriere be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of the plaintiff in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing as required by the Court. No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 8/10/2020. (JEJ)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Stuart Anderson answer due 8/26/2020. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 7/20/2020. (dcw)
July 17, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Stuart Anderson (Quin, William)
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Quin, II on behalf of Stuart Anderson (Quin, William)
July 10, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alysson Mills. Stuart Anderson served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Bass, Lilli)
July 8, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Brent B. Barriere to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alysson Mills (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Order Regarding Pro Hac Vice Admission Fees)(Bass, Lilli)
July 8, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Kristen D. Amond to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alysson Mills (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Order Regarding Pro Hac Vice Admission Fees)(Bass, Lilli)
June 26, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Alysson Mills. Shell Investments, LLC waiver sent on 6/26/2020, answer due 8/25/2020. (Bass, Lilli)
June 26, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Alysson Mills. James R. Shell waiver sent on 6/26/2020, answer due 8/25/2020. (Bass, Lilli)
June 26, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Stuart Anderson. (VM)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stuart Anderson, James R. Shell, Shell Investments, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0538-4307113), filed by Alysson Mills. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(VM) Modified on 6/26/2020 (VM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mills v. Anderson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alysson Mills
Represented By: Lilli Evans Bass
Represented By: Brent B. Barriere - PHV
Represented By: Kristen D. Amond - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James R. Shell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart Anderson
Represented By: William M. Quin, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?