Posey v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Mary Posey
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA General Counsel
Case Number: 3:2020cv00467
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Mary Posey. Commissioner of Social Security Administration served on 8/7/2020, answer due 11/5/2020. Service made upon: U S Attorney; U S Attorney General; Commissioner of SSA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Executed Affidavits of Mailing)(McHenry, Michael)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Filing of Briefs. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 8/11/2020. (JEJ)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (LAT)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 7/20/20 (dfk)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mary Posey. (VM)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration, filed by Mary Posey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Appeals Council Notice, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(VM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Posey v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Posey
Represented By: Michael B. McHenry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?