Blackmon v. Vanguard of Ripley, LLC
Plaintiff: Lashanda Blackmon
Defendant: Vanguard of Ripley, LLC d/b/a Rest Haven Health and Rehabilitation
Case Number: 3:2020cv00512
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Lashanda Blackmon (Norris, Robert)
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Vanguard of Ripley, LLC (Davis-Primer, Nakimuli)
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Vanguard of Ripley, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint)(Davis-Primer, Nakimuli)
August 7, 2020 Filing 5 ERROR - DISREGARD THIS ENTRY - DUPLICATE FILING; Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 9/16/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah) Modified on 8/7/2020 (Lewis, Nijah). Modified on 8/7/2020 (Lewis, Nijah).
August 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Nicholas Norris on behalf of Lashanda Blackmon (Norris, Robert)
August 7, 2020 Filing 3 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 9/16/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah)
August 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Blythe K. Lollar on behalf of Vanguard of Ripley, LLC (Lollar, Blythe)
August 7, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #5 - DUPLICATE FILING. (Lewis, Nijah)
August 7, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #5 : FILED IN WRONG CASE - DISREGARD ENTRY. (Lewis, Nijah)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Vanguard of Ripley, LLC from Circuit Court of Hinds County, Mississippi, case number 25CI1:20-CV-402-EFP ( Filing fee $ 400 paid; receipt number 0538-4340145 ). If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Filing a Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackmon v. Vanguard of Ripley, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanguard of Ripley, LLC d/b/a Rest Haven Health and Rehabilitation
Represented By: Nakimuli O. Davis-Primer
Represented By: Blythe K. Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lashanda Blackmon
Represented By: Louis H. Watson, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Nicholas Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?