Evans v. City of Jackson, Mississipi
Plaintiff: Donovan Evans
Defendant: City of Jackson, Mississipi
Case Number: 3:2020cv00533
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: John C Gargiulo
2 Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER *RESTRICTED* deferring ruling on #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 10/14/20 (Attachment A - IFP Application) (HM)
October 6, 2020 Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo added. Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball no longer assigned to case. (MGB)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 10/6/2020. (dcw)
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to #3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Mail sent to Donovan Evans. (PG)
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 Change of Address filed by Donovan Evans 1504 18th Ave., Meridian, MS 39301 (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cwl)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER *RESTRICTED* deferring ruling on #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. That within fifteen (15) days of the entry of this order, Plaintiff shall file with this Court a completed Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) or pay the required filing fee of $400.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 8/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form)). (dcw)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Donovan Evans. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Envelope Hattiesburg)(PG)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Jackson, Mississipi, filed by Donovan Evans. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Envelope Hattiesburg)(PG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. City of Jackson, Mississipi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donovan Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Jackson, Mississipi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?