Segura et al v. Overnight Parts Alliance, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Adelita Barrera Lugo, Felipa Lugo Segura, Rufina Lugo Segura, Laura Lugo Segura, Juan Carlos Lugo and Maria Onecima Lugo
Defendant: Wholesale Parts Alliance, LLC, Steven McKinney Individually and doing business as Overnight Parts Alliance, LLC, Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P. and Overnight Parts Alliance, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00537
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Tom S Lee
2 Judge: Robert P Myers
3 Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 13 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers Jr. (SR)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER LIFTING #8 STAY OF PROCEEDINGS. Order denying motion to remand entered 10/8/2020. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on 10/9/2020 (SR)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Memorandum Opinion and Order denying re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court ; dismissing Penske Truck Leasing Co., as set out herein ( Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P. terminated.) Signed by District Judge Tom S. Lee on 10/8/20 (LWE)
September 21, 2020 Filing 11 Rebuttal re #7 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #9 Response in Opposition to Motion, #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #10 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Adelita Barrera Lugo, Juan Carlos Lugo, Maria Onecima Lugo, Felipa Lugo Segura, Laura Lugo Segura, Rufina Lugo Segura (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Stevens, John)
September 11, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Steven McKinney, Overnight Parts Alliance, LLC, Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P., Wholesale Parts Alliance, LLC (Ellingburg, C.)
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Steven McKinney, Overnight Parts Alliance, LLC, Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P., Wholesale Parts Alliance, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Ex B Windham Affidavit, #2 Affidavit Ex C Hansen Affidavit)(Ellingburg, C.)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER Cancelling Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers Jr. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on 8/31/2020 (SR)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on 8/31/2020. (SR)
August 28, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #6 , #7 : Docket entries fails to select all filing parties. Clerks office will edit the docket entries to include all appropriate filing parties. Attorney is directed to select all filing parties in future filings. (cwl)
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Felipa Lugo Segura, Rufina Lugo Segura, Laura Lugo Segura, Maria Onecima Lugo, Juan Carlos Lugo and Adelita Barrera Lugo (Stevens, John) Modified on 8/28/2020 (cwl).
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Felipa Lugo Segura, Rufina Lugo Segura, Laura Lugo Segura, Juan Carlos Lugo and Adelita Barrera Lugo (Stevens, John) Modified on 8/28/2020 (cwl).
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers Jr. (SR)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Steven McKinney, Overnight Parts Alliance, LLC, Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P., Wholesale Parts Alliance, LLC (Ellingburg, C.)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER Cancelling Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 9/30/2020 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on 8/21/2020 (SR)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Tom S. Lee and Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr for all further proceedings. District Judge Henry T. Wingate, Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson no longer assigned to case Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 8/20/20 (MGB)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 9/30/2020 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Overnight Parts Alliance, LLC, Wholesale Parts Alliance, LLC, Steven McKinney, Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P. from Circuit Court of Kemper County, Mississippi, case number 20-44. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 34643060514) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Windham, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Hansen, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(VM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Segura et al v. Overnight Parts Alliance, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adelita Barrera Lugo
Represented By: John Hunter Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felipa Lugo Segura
Represented By: John Hunter Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rufina Lugo Segura
Represented By: John Hunter Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Lugo Segura
Represented By: John Hunter Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Carlos Lugo
Represented By: John Hunter Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Onecima Lugo
Represented By: John Hunter Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wholesale Parts Alliance, LLC
Represented By: C. Michael Ellingburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven McKinney Individually and doing business as Overnight Parts Alliance, LLC
Represented By: C. Michael Ellingburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P.
Represented By: C. Michael Ellingburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Overnight Parts Alliance, LLC
Represented By: C. Michael Ellingburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?