Martinez et al v. Overnight Parts Alliance, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ernestina Martinez, Erika Lugo Martinez and Maria Teresa Lugo Martinez
Defendant: Wholesale Parts Alliance, LLC, Steven McKinney Individually and doing business as Overnight Parts Allinace, LLC, Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P. and Overnight Parts Alliance, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00541
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Tom S Lee
2 Judge: Robert P Myers
3 Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Memorandum Opinion and Order denying #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court ; dismissing Penske Truck Leasing Co., as set out herein. (Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P. terminated.) Signed by District Judge Tom S. Lee on 10/8/20 (LWE)
September 21, 2020 Filing 10 Rebuttal re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #9 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #8 Response in Opposition to Motion, #6 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Erika Lugo Martinez, Ernestina Martinez, Maria Teresa Lugo Martinez (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Stevens, John)
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Steven McKinney, Overnight Parts Alliance, LLC, Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P., Wholesale Parts Alliance, LLC (Ellingburg, C.)
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Steven McKinney, Overnight Parts Alliance, LLC, Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P., Wholesale Parts Alliance, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Ex B Windham Affidavit, #2 Affidavit Ex C Hansen Affidavit)(Ellingburg, C.)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER Cancelling Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers Jr. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on 8/31/2020 (SR)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on 8/31/2020. (SR)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Ernestina Martinez (Stevens, John)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Ernestina Martinez (Stevens, John)
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers Jr. (SR)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Steven McKinney, Overnight Parts Alliance, LLC, Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P., Wholesale Parts Alliance, LLC (Ellingburg, C.)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Tom S. Lee and Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr for all further proceedings. District Judge Carlton W. Reeves, Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball no longer assigned to case Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 8/20/20 (MGB)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Steven McKinney, Overnight Parts Alliance, LLC, Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P., Wholesale Parts Alliance, LLC from Circuit - Kemper, case number 2020-cv-48WS. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 34643060514) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Clerk's Certification, #2 Exhibit B Affidavit of Marvin S. Windham, #3 Exhibit C Affidavit of Kresten Hansen II, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(cwl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez et al v. Overnight Parts Alliance, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wholesale Parts Alliance, LLC
Represented By: C. Michael Ellingburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven McKinney Individually and doing business as Overnight Parts Allinace, LLC
Represented By: C. Michael Ellingburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P.
Represented By: C. Michael Ellingburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Overnight Parts Alliance, LLC
Represented By: C. Michael Ellingburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernestina Martinez
Represented By: John Hunter Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erika Lugo Martinez
Represented By: John Hunter Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Teresa Lugo Martinez
Represented By: John Hunter Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?