A.W. v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: A. W.
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company and Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00551
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Myers, Michael)
September 24, 2020 Filing 8 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 12/3/2020 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company answer due 10/2/2020. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 9/18/2020. (dcw)
September 17, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Myers, Michael)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Shelter Mutual Insurance Company.(Morton, William)
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by William Lock Morton, III on behalf of Shelter Mutual Insurance Company (Morton, William)
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by A. W.. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company served on 8/21/2020, answer due 9/11/2020. (Timbs, Megan)
August 26, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by A. W.. Shelter Mutual Insurance Company served on 8/21/2020, answer due 9/11/2020. (Timbs, Megan)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (LAT)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 34643060521), filed by A. W.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.W. v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael F. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: William Lock Morton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. W.
Represented By: Megan E. Timbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?