Shavers v. Hughes et al
Plaintiff: Brandi C. Shavers
Defendant: J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc. and Rudolfo Blue Hughes
Case Number: 3:2020cv00554
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Extenstion of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production by Rudolfo Blue Hughes, J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc. (Smith, Margaret)
October 15, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Rudolfo Blue Hughes (Smith, Margaret)
October 15, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc. (Smith, Margaret)
September 30, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by Brandi C. Shavers (Simon, Anthony)
September 30, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure by Rudolfo Blue Hughes, J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc. (Smith, Margaret)
September 23, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Service of Request for Production by J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc. (Loveless, Caroline)
September 23, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories by J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc. (Loveless, Caroline)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER; Disclosure due by 9/30/2020; Jury Trial set for 9/20/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (Jackson) Wingate before District Judge Henry T. Wingate; Pretrial Conference set for 8/13/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (Jackson) Wingate before District Judge Henry T. Wingate ; Discovery due by 4/6/2021; Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 10/19/2020; Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 10/19/2020; Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 1/8/2021; Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 2/8/2021; Motions due by 4/20/2021; Settlement Conference set for 3/25/2021 09:00 AM in Chambers 6.150 (Jackson) Anderson before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson ; ADR Report due by 8/6/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 9/17/2020 (Lewis, Nijah)
September 17, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 9/17/2020. Participants: Anthony Simon, Margaret Smith and Caroline Loveless. The Court spoke with counsel. Order to be entered. (Lewis, Nijah)
September 14, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 9/17/2020 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson (Lewis, Nijah)
September 14, 2020 NOTICE OF TIME CHANGE: The time for the TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE set for Thursday, September 17, 2020 is being moved to 2:30 pm. ONLY THE TIME IS CHANGING. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah)
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent J.B. Hunt Transport Services, Inc. for J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc.. (Smith, Margaret)
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 State Court Record by Defendants Rudolfo Blue Hughes, J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc. (Smith, Margaret)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 9/17/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent J. B. Hunt Transport Services, Inc. for J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc.. (Smith, Margaret)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Rudolfo Blue Hughes (Smith, Margaret)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc. (Smith, Margaret)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline C. Loveless on behalf of Rudolfo Blue Hughes, J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc. (Loveless, Caroline)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Rudolfo Blue Hughes, J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc. from Hinds County Circuit Court, MS, case number 25CI1:20-cv-440-EFP. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4351812) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shavers v. Hughes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Caroline C. Loveless
Represented By: Margaret Z. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rudolfo Blue Hughes
Represented By: Caroline C. Loveless
Represented By: Margaret Z. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandi C. Shavers
Represented By: Anthony R. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?