Johnson v. P.A.M. Transport, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Ralo A. Johnson
Defendant: Robert J. Gaidarik, P.A.M. Transport, Inc, P.A.M Cartage Carriers, LLC and Does 1-5
Case Number: 3:2020cv00624
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER consolidating cases for all purposes. The first-filed case, No. 3:20-CV-555, shall be the lead case. All future filings shall be made in the lead case. The Clerk shall make appropriate revisions to the docket sheets. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 11/16/2020 (cwl)
November 6, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by Robert J. Gaidarik.(Dunbar, David)
November 6, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by P.A.M Cartage Carriers, LLC.(Dunbar, David)
November 6, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by P.A.M. Transport, Inc.(Dunbar, David)
November 3, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Ralo A. Johnson.(Williamson, Robert)
October 30, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by P.A.M Cartage Carriers, LLC, P.A.M. Transport, Inc (Dunbar, David)
October 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher G. Dunnells on behalf of Robert J. Gaidarik, P.A.M Cartage Carriers, LLC, P.A.M. Transport, Inc (Dunnells, Christopher)
October 27, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by P.A.M. Transport, Inc.(Dunbar, David)
October 27, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Robert J. Gaidarik.(Dunbar, David)
October 27, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by P.A.M Cartage Carriers, LLC.(Dunbar, David)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Robert J. Gaidarik, P.A.M Cartage Carriers, LLC, P.A.M. Transport, Inc. (LAT)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Does 1-5, Robert J. Gaidarik, P.A.M Cartage Carriers, LLC, P.A.M. Transport, Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 34643060900), filed by Ralo A. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. P.A.M. Transport, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralo A. Johnson
Represented By: Robert C. Williamson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Gaidarik
Represented By: David C. Dunbar
Represented By: Christopher G. Dunnells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.A.M. Transport, Inc
Represented By: David C. Dunbar
Represented By: Christopher G. Dunnells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.A.M Cartage Carriers, LLC
Represented By: David C. Dunbar
Represented By: Christopher G. Dunnells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?