Spells v. Thomas et al
Plaintiff: Dennis Spells
Defendant: ACCC Insurance Company, Airica Thomas and Okee's Insurance Agency, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00636
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by O. Stephen Montagnet, III on behalf of Okee's Insurance Agency, Inc. (Montagnet, O.)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER cancelling CMC on 11/16/2020 at 9:30 a.m. due to notice of receivership and stay. NO WRITTEN ORDER TO FOLLOW. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 11/2/2020. (ACF)
October 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Automatic Stay of Proceedings by ACCC Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Agreed Order)(McNees, Edward)
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 State Court Record by Defendant ACCC Insurance Company Volumes 1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit State Court Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Summons Issued to ACCC Insurance, #4 Exhibit Summons Issued to Okechukwu Ezejoifo c/o Okee's Insurance Agency, Inc., #5 Exhibit Notice of Notice of Removal)(McNees, Edward)
October 7, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by ACCC Insurance Company.(McNees, Edward)
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah)
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Russell McNees on behalf of ACCC Insurance Company (McNees, Edward)
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ACCC Insurance Company (McNees, Edward)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ACCC Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Hinds County, MS, case number 25CI1:20-cv-500-TTG. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid; receipt number 0538-4383978) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Docket, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spells v. Thomas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACCC Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert Bradley Best
Represented By: Edward Russell McNees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airica Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Okee's Insurance Agency, Inc.
Represented By: O. Stephen Montagnet, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Spells
Represented By: Bryant D. Guy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?