Morgan v. SJ Group Holding LLC et al
Plaintiff: Diane Morgan
Defendant: John Does 1-5 and SJ Group Holding LLC d/b/a/ Greenbriar Apartments
Case Number: 3:2020cv00684
Filed: October 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Kristi H Johnson
2 Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2020 Attorneys are advised to include the case number and the new judge assignment of 3:20cv684KHJ-LRA on future filed pleadings. (MGB)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Kristi H. Johnson for all further proceedings. District Judge Henry T. Wingate no longer assigned to case Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 12/14/20 (MGB)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Disclosure due by 12/23/2020; Jury Trial set for 11/15/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (Jackson) Wingate before District Judge Henry T. Wingate; Pretrial Conference set for 10/8/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (Jackson) Wingate before District Judge Henry T. Wingate; Discovery due by 6/1/2021 ; Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 1/11/2021; Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 1/11/2021; Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 3/2/2021; Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 4/1/2021 ; Motions due by 6/15/2021; Settlement Conference set for 8/17/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6D (Jackson) Anderson before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson; ADR Report due by 10/8/2021 Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 12/10/2020 (Lewis, Nijah)
December 9, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 12/9/2020. Participants: Bryant Guy and Frederick Salvo, III. The Court spoke with counsel. Order to be entered. (Lewis, Nijah)
October 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Lott Warren on behalf of SJ Group Holding LLC (Warren, Joseph)
October 27, 2020 Filing 2 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 12/9/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah)
October 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SJ Group Holding LLC from 7th Circuit Court of Hinds County, MS, case number 25CI1:20-cv-454-TTG. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4402080) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff's Responses to Request for Admission, #3 Exhibit 3 - State Court Record, #4 Exhibit 4 - Certificate of Formation, #5 Exhibit 5 - Notice of Filing of Removal, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgan v. SJ Group Holding LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Morgan
Represented By: Bryant D. Guy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SJ Group Holding LLC d/b/a/ Greenbriar Apartments
Represented By: Frederick N. Salvo, III.
Represented By: Joseph Lott Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?