Holdiness v. Tractor Supply Company et al
Plaintiff: Barbara Holdiness
Defendant: John Does 1-10, Unifirst Corporation and Tractor Supply Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00689
Filed: October 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Gregg Rogers on behalf of Barbara Holdiness (Rogers, R.)
November 23, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Unifirst Corporation (Hays, Bradley)
November 23, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Unifirst Corporation.(Hays, Bradley)
November 20, 2020 Filing 4 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 1/15/2021 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ)
November 16, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Tractor Supply Company.(Vines, William)
October 28, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Tractor Supply Company, Unifirst Corporation. (VM)
October 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tractor Supply Company, Unifirst Corporation (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0538-4404283), filed by Barbara Holdiness. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(VM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holdiness v. Tractor Supply Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Holdiness
Represented By: Shanda M. Yates
Represented By: R. Gregg Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unifirst Corporation
Represented By: Bradley Adam Hays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tractor Supply Company
Represented By: William Matthew Vines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?