Covington Specialty Insurance Company v. McClendon Security, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Covington Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: McClendon Security, LLC and Allanna Robinson
Case Number: 3:2020cv00692
Filed: October 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Covington Specialty Insurance Company. McClendon Security, LLC served on 11/1/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (Julian, Thomas)
October 29, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to McClendon Security, LLC. (cwl)
October 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against McClendon Security, LLC and Allanna Robinson ( Filing fee $ 400 paid; receipt number 0538-4404738 ), filed by Covington Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Exhibit B - First Amended Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Covington Specialty Insurance Company v. McClendon Security, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McClendon Security, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allanna Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Covington Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas R. Julian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?