Franklin et al v. Fendi et al
Plaintiff: Angela Amerson, S. R., D. G. and Alonzo Franklin
Defendant: Karwan G. Fendi, John Does 1-10 and National Car Rental System, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00693
Filed: October 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Filing 5 Letter from Michael Watson, Secretary of State as to National Car Rental System, Inc., re: Service of Process. (PG)
November 12, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to Doc. #4 Incorrect event chosen. This document should have been docketed as Letter. (PG)
November 12, 2020 Filing 4 **ERROR**Disregard this entry. Secretary of State's ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed, as to National Car Rental System, Inc. served on 11/10/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (PG) Modified on 11/13/2020 (PG).
November 2, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alonzo Franklin, Angela Amerson, S. R., D. G.. National Car Rental System, Inc. served on 10/29/2020, answer due 11/19/2020. (Martin, Deshun)
October 28, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to National Car Rental System, Inc.. (PG)
October 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Karwan G. Fendi, National Car Rental System, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 34643061265), filed by Alonzo Franklin, Angela Amerson, S. R., D. G.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State of MS Uniform Crash Report)(PG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franklin et al v. Fendi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karwan G. Fendi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Car Rental System, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Amerson
Represented By: Deshun T. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. R.
Represented By: Deshun T. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. G.
Represented By: Deshun T. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alonzo Franklin
Represented By: Deshun T. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?