Hutchins v. The United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Tiffany Hutchins
Defendant: John Does I-III and The United States of America
Case Number: 3:2020cv00698
Filed: October 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Kristi H Johnson
2 Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint by The United States of America.(Mayer-Federal Gov, Robert)
December 14, 2020 Attorneys are advised to include the case number and the new judge assignment of 3:20cv698KHJ-FKB on future filed pleadings. (MGB)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Kristi H. Johnson for all further proceedings. Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III no longer assigned to case Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 12/14/20 (MGB)
November 17, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tiffany Hutchins. The United States of America served on 11/9/2020, answer due 12/29/2020. (Wade, Thandi)
November 5, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #4 : Incorrect event selected. Event should have been "Summons Return Executed as to USA." No need to refile. Clerk's office has modified entry to show answer deadline for United States of America is 12/29/20. (PKM)
November 5, 2020 Set Deadlines: The United States of America served on 10/30/2020, answer deadline reset: answer due 12/29/20. (PKM)
November 4, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tiffany Hutchins. The United States of America served on 10/30/2020, answer due 12/29/20. (Wade, Thandi) Modified on 11/5/2020 (PKM).
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Tiffany Hutchins.(Wade, Thandi)
October 29, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to The United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (PG)
October 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The United States of America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 34643061284), filed by Tiffany Hutchins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(PG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hutchins v. The United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does I-III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Represented By: Robert Gregg Mayer-Federal Gov, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Hutchins
Represented By: Thandi Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?