Musee, LLC v. Avior Nutritionals, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Musee, LLC
Defendant: Stephen M. Camp and Avior Nutritionals, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00707
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Filing 28 ANSWER to #27 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Musee, LLC.(Kidd, Dean)
December 2, 2020 Filing 27 AMENDED ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Musee, LLC by Stephen M. Camp, Avior Nutritionals, LLC (Stroble, Joseph)
December 2, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #26 : Attorney advises that there is an error in this entry, and it should be disregarded. It will be correctly refiled. (LAT)
December 2, 2020 Filing 26 ***ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY.*** ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Musee, LLC by Stephen M. Camp, Avior Nutritionals, LLC.(Stroble, Joseph) Modified on 12/2/2020 (LAT).
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Avior's Answer is now due 12/2/2020. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 11/20/2020. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE ON THIS MOTION. (gb)
November 20, 2020 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #9 Amended Complaint by Avior Nutritionals, LLC, Stephen M. Camp (Barnes, Jonathan)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ONLY ORDER. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65, the Court held an evidentiary hearing on the Plaintiffs Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. Upon consideration of the pleadings submitted, testimony, evidence, and the arguments of counsel, and for the reasons stated in the Courts ruling from the Bench on November 18, 2020, the Court finds that Plaintiffs request for a preliminary injunction is denied. Accordingly, the Court hereby finds as moot #7 to Limit Scope of Preliminary Injunction Hearing; and denies #14 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 11/19/2020. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE.(gb)
November 19, 2020 Filing 23 Plaintiff's Exhibit List by Musee, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P-2, #2 Exhibit P-12)(TRS)
November 19, 2020 Filing 22 Plaintiff's Witness List by Musee, LLC (TRS)
November 18, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves: Evidentiary Hearing held on 11/18/2020. PARTICIPANTS: Dean Sterling Kidd (Plaintiff's counsel), Leisha Pickering (Representative for Musee, LLC); Joseph Jason Stroble, Michael Casey Williams, and Jonathan M. Barnes (Defense counsel), Stephen Camp, Defendant. Testimony and evidence were presented before the Court. Plaintiff's witnesses: Amanda Jones and Leisha Pickering. Exhibits admitted: P-2, P-12. P-6 (ID ONLY). The Court DENIED #14 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Court Reporter/Transcriber Candice Crane, Telephone Number : 601-608-4187. (TRS)
November 18, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Limit Scope of Preliminary Injunction Hearing to Trade Secrets Claim and for Expedited Hearing on Motion to Limit Scope filed by Musee, LLC (Kidd, Dean)
November 17, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #17 AND #18 : Incorrect events chosen. Documents have been correctly refiled as #19 and #20 . (KNS)
November 17, 2020 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Response to Defendants' Motion to Limit Scope of Preliminary Injunction Hearing filed by Avior Nutritionals, LLC, Stephen M. Camp (Stroble, Joseph)
November 17, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Response to Defendants' Motion to Limit Scope of Preliminary Injunction Hearing filed by Avior Nutritionals, LLC, Stephen M. Camp (Stroble, Joseph)
November 17, 2020 Filing 18 ***ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY***MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #9 Amended Complaint filed by Avior Nutritionals, LLC, Stephen M. Camp (Stroble, Joseph) Modified on 11/17/2020 (KNS).
November 17, 2020 Filing 17 ***ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY***RESPONSE to Motion re #9 Amended Complaint filed by Avior Nutritionals, LLC, Stephen M. Camp (Stroble, Joseph) Modified on 11/17/2020 (KNS).
November 17, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #14 : Multiple documents filed as one pleading. Attorney is directed to file each document separately (the same PDF document should be used) selecting correct event. (KNS)
November 17, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #10 #11 #12 and #13 : Attorney advises that there is an error and these documents should be disregarded. The documents will be correctly refiled. (VM)
November 16, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Limit Scope of Preliminary Injunction Hearing to Trade Secrets Claim and for Expedited Hearing on Motion to Limit Scope filed by Musee, LLC (Kidd, Dean)
November 16, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Response to Defendants' Motion to Limit Scope of Preliminary Injunction Hearing filed by Musee, LLC (Kidd, Dean)
November 16, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Response to Defendants' Motion to Limit Scope of Preliminary Injunction Hearing by Musee, LLC (Kidd, Dean)
November 16, 2020 Filing 13 **ERROR** Disregard this entry. MOTION Witness List by Avior Nutritionals, LLC, Stephen M. Camp (Stroble, Joseph) Modified on 11/17/2020 (VM).
November 16, 2020 Filing 12 **ERROR** Disregard this entry. MOTION Exhibit List by Avior Nutritionals, LLC, Stephen M. Camp (Stroble, Joseph) Modified on 11/17/2020 (VM).
November 16, 2020 Filing 11 **ERROR** Disregard this entry. MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Avior Nutritionals, LLC, Stephen M. Camp (Stroble, Joseph) Modified on 11/17/2020 (VM).
November 16, 2020 Filing 10 **ERROR** Disregard this entry. MOTION for Permanent Injunction by Avior Nutritionals, LLC, Stephen M. Camp (Stroble, Joseph) Modified on 11/17/2020 (VM).
November 12, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Musee, LLC.(Kidd, Dean)
November 12, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Limit Scope of Preliminary Injunction Hearing to Trade Secrets Claim and for Expedited Hearing on Motion to Limit Scope filed by Avior Nutritionals, LLC, Stephen M. Camp (Barnes, Jonathan)
November 12, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Limit Scope of Preliminary Injunction Hearing to Trade Secrets Claim and for Expedited Hearing on Motion to Limit Scope by Avior Nutritionals, LLC, Stephen M. Camp (Barnes, Jonathan)
November 11, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Casey Williams on behalf of Avior Nutritionals, LLC, Stephen M. Camp (Williams, Michael)
November 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan M. Barnes on behalf of Avior Nutritionals, LLC, Stephen M. Camp (Barnes, Jonathan)
November 9, 2020 Set Hearings: Evidentiary Hearing (TRO) set for 11/18/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5B (Jackson) Reeves before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves (TRS)
November 9, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves: Telephone Conference held on 11/9/2020. PARTICIPANTS: Sterling Kidd (Plaintiff's counsel); Jason Strobel and Jonathan Butler (Defense counsel). A TRO hearing is set for 10:00 a.m. on Nov. 18. The parties are permitted to file any pretrial briefs, including Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, by close of business, Monday, November 16. The parties will exchange any exhibits on or before that date as well. This is to advise the parties that they are to provide the exhibits, exhibit lists and witness lists by close of business, 11/16. (TRS).
November 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Jason Stroble on behalf of Avior Nutritionals, LLC, Stephen M. Camp (Stroble, Joseph)
November 5, 2020 Set Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 11/9/2020 02:00 PM before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves (TRS)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL - Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III recused and Case reassigned to District Judge Carlton W. Reeves for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 11/3/2020 (ND)
November 3, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Avior Nutritionals, LLC, Stephen M. Camp. (KNS)
November 2, 2020 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT against Avior Nutritionals, LLC, Stephen M. Camp ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4408269), filed by Musee, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Musee, LLC v. Avior Nutritionals, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen M. Camp
Represented By: Jonathan M. Barnes
Represented By: Michael Casey Williams
Represented By: Joseph Jason Stroble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avior Nutritionals, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan M. Barnes
Represented By: Michael Casey Williams
Represented By: Joseph Jason Stroble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Musee, LLC
Represented By: Dean Sterling Kidd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?