Perry v. Loyal American Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Vickie Perry
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-10 and Loyal American Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00710
Filed: November 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Tom S Lee
Referring Judge: Robert P Myers
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER Cancelling Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 12/21/2020 10:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers Jr. Notice of Settlement entered 12/16/2020. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on 12/16/2020 (SR)
December 16, 2020 NOTICE of Settlement by All Parties per email notification received from attorney Walter D. Wilson. The parties shall have 21 days to consummate the settlement. Absent the parties requesting additional time to effectuate settlement, the Court will enter a final judgment. (SR)
November 12, 2020 Filing 5 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 12/21/2020 10:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers Jr. (SR)
November 11, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Loyal American Life Insurance Company (Willson, Walter)
November 11, 2020 Filing 3 State Court Record by Defendant Loyal American Life Insurance Company (Willson, Walter)
November 10, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Loyal American Life Insurance Company (Willson, Walter)
November 4, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #1 : Court staff modified docket text to reflect the appropriate state court level of removal. (LAT)
November 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Loyal American Life Insurance Company from County Court of Hinds County, MS, case number 25CO1:20-cv-3335-LCS. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4408936) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons Return on Loyal American Life Ins Co, #3 Exhibit C - Process, pleadings served on Loyal American Life Ins Co, #4 Attachment State Court Complaint, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT) Modified on 11/4/2020 (LAT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perry v. Loyal American Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickie Perry
Represented By: Thomas J. Bellinder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loyal American Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Walter D. Willson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?