Blackmon v. The United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Jeanette Blackmon
Defendant: John Does A, B, and C and The United States of America
Case Number: 3:2020cv00739
Filed: November 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: LaKeysha Greer Isaac
2 Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeanette Blackmon. The United States of America served on 1/6/2021, answer due 3/8/2021. (Kucia, Gerald)
January 5, 2021 Parties should include the case number new Judge assignment of 3:20cv739HTW-LGI on future filings. (MGB)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson no longer assigned to case Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 1/5/21 (MGB)
December 29, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeanette Blackmon. The United States of America served on 11/24/2020, answer due 1/25/2021. (Kucia, Gerald)
November 20, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: The United States of America answer due 1/17/2021. (KNS)
November 20, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeanette Blackmon. The United States of America served on 11/18/2020, answer due 01/17/2021. (Kucia, Gerald) Modified on 11/20/2020 (KNS).
November 20, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #4 : Incorrect event chosen. This document should have been docketed as Summons Returned Executed as to USA. Attorney is directed to refile using the correct event. (KNS)
November 19, 2020 Filing 4 ***ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY***SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeanette Blackmon. The United States of America served on 11/18/2020, answer due 12/9/2020. (Kucia, Gerald) Modified on 11/20/2020 (KNS).
November 19, 2020 Filing 3 ATTACHMENT re #1 Complaint Exhibit A to Complaint - Administrative Claim and USPS Acknowledgment by Jeanette Blackmon (Kucia, Gerald)
November 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to The United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (VM)
November 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The United States of America (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0538-4418363), filed by Jeanette Blackmon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(VM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackmon v. The United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanette Blackmon
Represented By: Gerald L. Kucia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does A, B, and C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?