Gordon v. J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Walter Gordon
Defendant: John Does #1-10 and J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00746
Filed: November 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Tom S Lee
Referring Judge: Robert P Myers
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA to Produce Documents by Walter Gordon (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Wilkins, Robert)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Disclosure due by 1/26/2021. Jury Trial during a four-week term of Court beginning on for 4/4/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4A (Jackson) before District Judge Tom S. Lee. Pretrial Conference set for 3/14/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4A (Jackson) before District Judge Tom S. Lee. Discovery due by 10/14/2021. Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 3/12/2021. Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 3/12/2021. Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 6/2/2021. Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 7/1/2021. Motions due by 10/28/2021. Settlement Conference set for 1/19/2022 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6C (Jackson) before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers Jr. ADR Report due by 3/7/2022. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/14/2022. EDT: 2-3 days. Parties do not consent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on 1/12/2021 (SR)
January 12, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 1/12/2021 with attorneys Philip W. Thomas, Arthur D. Spratlin Jr. and Caroline C. Loveless. (SR)
December 7, 2020 Filing 7 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 1/12/2021 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers Jr. (SR)
November 30, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent J.B. Hunt Transport Services, Inc. for J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.. (Spratlin, Arthur)
November 20, 2020 Filing 5 State Court Record by Defendant J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. (Smith, Margaret)
November 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur D. Spratlin, Jr on behalf of J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. (Spratlin, Arthur)
November 19, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. (Smith, Margaret)
November 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline C. Loveless on behalf of J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. (Loveless, Caroline)
November 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. from Circuit Court of Hinds County, Mississippi, case number 25CI1:20-cv-647-AHW. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid; receipt number 0538-4419866 ) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gordon v. J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Gordon
Represented By: Philip W. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does #1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Margaret Z. Smith
Represented By: Caroline C. Loveless
Represented By: Arthur D. Spratlin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?