Scott v. Pacific Bells, LLC
Plaintiff: Michelle Scott
Defendant: Pacific Bells, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00760
Filed: November 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Michelle Scott (Jelliffe, Martin)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Pacific Bells, LLC answer due 1/19/2021. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 12/29/2020. (dcw)
December 28, 2020 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Pacific Bells, LLC (Gallagher, Matthew)
November 24, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Join by Michelle Scott by Michelle Scott re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join)(Jelliffe, Martin)
November 24, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Pacific Bells, LLC. (LAT)
November 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Pacific Bells, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4424611), filed by Michelle Scott. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Pacific Bells, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Bells, LLC
Represented By: Matthew G. Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Scott
Represented By: Martin R. Jelliffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?