Slaughter v. Dobbs
Plaintiff: Charles Slaughter
Defendant: Dr. Thomas E. Dobbs
Case Number: 3:2020cv00789
Filed: December 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Thomas E. Dobbs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Excerpts from State Health Plans HHA CON (81-86_ 1986_ 1982-87)., #2 Exhibit 2-MS CON review manual (eff 2019)., #3 Exhibit 3-Excerpt of 2020 State Health Plan re HHA.)(Schelver-State Gov, Stephen)
January 22, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Thomas E. Dobbs answer due 2/5/2021. (dcw)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint #1 . Defendant's response to the Complaint #1 is due 2/5/2021. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 1/22/2021. (dcw)
January 21, 2021 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Thomas E. Dobbs (Schelver-State Gov, Stephen)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant's response is now due 01/22/2021. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE ON THIS MOTION. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 12/22/2020.(gb)
December 22, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Thomas E. Dobbs (Schelver-State Gov, Stephen)
December 18, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Slaughter. Thomas E. Dobbs served on 12/10/2020, answer due 12/31/2020. (Rice, Aaron)
December 10, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Seth Robbins on behalf of Charles Slaughter (Robbins, Andrew)
December 9, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Thomas E. Dobbs. (VM)
December 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Thomas E. Dobbs (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0538-443335), filed by Charles Slaughter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(VM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slaughter v. Dobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Slaughter
Represented By: Aaron Randall Rice
Represented By: A. Seth Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Thomas E. Dobbs
Represented By: Stephen F. Schelver-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?