Love v. Taylor et al
Plaintiff: Devine Love
Defendant: USPS, Shasta Coleman, Eric Clay, Diamond G. Allen Taylor and Lee Bruce
Case Number: 3:2020cv00807
Filed: December 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Individual Defendants by Devine Love. (VM)
February 1, 2021 Filing 6 Plaintiff's NOTICE of All Claims by Devine Love. (VM)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Response to Order re #3 ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. On or before 1/19/2021, Plaintiff shall file a statement with the Court as directed herein or pay the required filing fee of $402.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 12/18/2020. (dcw) filed by Devine Love (Attachments: #1 Copy of Motion to Proceed IFP)(cwl)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. On or before 1/19/2021, Plaintiff shall file a statement with the Court as directed herein or pay the required filing fee of $402.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 12/18/2020. (dcw)
December 17, 2020 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Devine Love. (ND)
December 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against USPS, Lee Bruce, Eric Clay, Shasta Coleman and Diamond G. Allen Taylor filed by Devine Love. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Love v. Taylor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shasta Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Clay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond G. Allen Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devine Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?