Jones v. Sanders et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Jones
Defendant: Ashley Sanders-Sheifert Holdings, Emily Sanders Show, Tru-Trust Company, Int'l, Ashley Sanders doing business as Sheifert Properties, Metro Center Mall, Repair of the Breach Foundation, Tenia Sanders, Ashley Sanders and Sheifert, Emily Sanders, MetroCenter Jackson, Ashley Sanders White, John Doe Numbers 1-5 and Merrick Sanders
Case Number: 3:2021cv00030
Filed: January 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #11 . Memoranda in support should be filed separately and shown as a related document to the motion (Court's Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Sec. 3.A.7). Attorney is directed to file the Memorandum as a separate document and link it to the appropriate document. (ND)
March 15, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #10 . Memoranda in support should be filed separately and shown as a related document to the motion (Court's Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Sec. 3.A.7). Attorney is directed to file the Memorandum as a separate document and link it to the appropriate document. (ND)
March 12, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Memorandum In Support Thereof by Ashley Sanders, Ashley Sanders and Sheifert, Ashley Sanders-Sheifert Holdings, Emily Sanders Show, Metro Center Mall, MetroCenter Jackson, Repair of the Breach Foundation, Emily Sanders, Merrick Sanders, Tenia Sanders, Tru-Trust Company, Int'l, Ashley Sanders White (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stamps, Larry)
March 12, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Set Aside Entry of Default and Memorandum In Support Thereof by Ashley Sanders, Ashley Sanders and Sheifert, Ashley Sanders-Sheifert Holdings, Emily Sanders Show, Metro Center Mall, MetroCenter Jackson, Repair of the Breach Foundation, Emily Sanders, Merrick Sanders, Tenia Sanders, Tru-Trust Company, Int'l, Ashley Sanders White (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stamps, Larry)
February 26, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Larry Stamps on behalf of Ashley Sanders, Ashley Sanders and Sheifert, Ashley Sanders-Sheifert Holdings, Emily Sanders Show, Metro Center Mall, MetroCenter Jackson, Repair of the Breach Foundation, Emily Sanders, Merrick Sanders, Tenia Sanders, Tru-Trust Company, Int'l, Ashley Sanders White (Stamps, Larry)
February 24, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher Jones. Ashley Sanders and Sheifert served on 1/19/2021, answer due 2/9/2021; Ashley Sanders-Sheifert Holdings served on 1/19/2021, answer due 2/9/2021; Metro Center Mall served on 1/19/2021, answer due 2/9/2021; MetroCenter Jackson served on 1/19/2021, answer due 2/9/2021; Repair of the Breach Foundation served on 1/19/2021, answer due 2/9/2021; Emily Sanders served on 1/19/2021, answer due 2/9/2021; Merrick Sanders served on 1/19/2021, answer due 2/9/2021; Tru-Trust Company, Int'l served on 1/19/2021, answer due 2/9/2021. (ND)
February 24, 2021 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of #4 MOTION for Entry of Default, filed by Christopher Jones. (Attachments: #1 Envelope 1, #2 Envelope 2)(ND)
February 24, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File RICO Statement, filed by Christopher Jones. (Attachments: #1 Envelope 1, #2 Envelope 2)(ND)
February 16, 2021 Filing 5 To the extent document #4 seeks a Clerk's entry of default, the Clerk declines to do so because the record does not reflect proof of service of process. Accordingly, under FRCP 55(a), the defendants' alleged failure to plead or otherwise defend this matter has not been shown "by affidavit or otherwise." Although the plaintiff's motion #4 states that service of process was achieved and although it references both an affidavit and an "Exhibit 2" (which is described as a "copy of the Process Receipt and Return and Summons"), neither was attached. (ASJ)
February 12, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Entry of Default by Christopher Jones. (LAT)
January 15, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ashley Sanders and Sheifert, Ashley Sanders-Sheifert Holdings, Metro Center Mall, MetroCenter Jackson, Repair of the Breach Foundation, Emily Sanders, Merrick Sanders, Tru-Trust Company, Int'l. (LAT)
January 15, 2021 Filing 2 RICO Notice. (LAT) (Main Document 2 replaced on 1/15/2021) (LAT).
January 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR CIVIL RICO, FRAUD, RACKETEERING, CIVIL CONSPIRACY, COMMERCIAL FRAUD with JURY DEMAND against Ashley Sanders, John Doe Numbers 1-5, Repairer of the Breach, Emily Sanders, Merrick Sanders, Tenia Sanders, Ashley Sanders White ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 34643062093), filed by Christopher Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Sanders et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Sanders-Sheifert Holdings
Represented By: Larry Stamps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Sanders Show
Represented By: Larry Stamps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tru-Trust Company, Int'l
Represented By: Larry Stamps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Sanders doing business as Sheifert Properties
Represented By: Larry Stamps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro Center Mall
Represented By: Larry Stamps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Repair of the Breach Foundation
Represented By: Larry Stamps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tenia Sanders
Represented By: Larry Stamps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Sanders and Sheifert
Represented By: Larry Stamps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Sanders
Represented By: Larry Stamps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MetroCenter Jackson
Represented By: Larry Stamps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Sanders White
Represented By: Larry Stamps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Numbers 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick Sanders
Represented By: Larry Stamps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?