Regions Bank v. Antoine et al
Plaintiff: Regions Bank
Defendant: Arielle M. Collins and Gwendolyn Antoine
Case Number: 3:2021cv00040
Filed: January 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2021 Filing 23 Rebuttal re #21 Response in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Gwendolyn Antoine (Robinson, Abby)
March 10, 2021 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #19 MOTION for Reconsideration re #18 Order on Motion to Compel,, Order on Motion to Stay Proceedings,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, , #21 Response in Opposition to Motion,, #20 Second MOTION for Reconsideration re #19 MOTION for Reconsideration re #18 Order on Motion to Compel,, Order on Motion to Stay Proceedings,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, , #18 Order o filed by Regions Bank (Slay, La'Toyia)
March 10, 2021 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION for Reconsideration re #18 Order on Motion to Compel,, Order on Motion to Stay Proceedings,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, , #20 Second MOTION for Reconsideration re #19 MOTION for Reconsideration re #18 Order on Motion to Compel,, Order on Motion to Stay Proceedings,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, , #18 Order o filed by Regions Bank (Slay, La'Toyia)
February 24, 2021 Filing 20 Second MOTION for Reconsideration re #19 MOTION for Reconsideration re #18 Order on Motion to Compel,, Order on Motion to Stay Proceedings,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, , #18 Order on Motion to Compel,, Order on Motion to Stay Proceedings,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, includes exhibits that were not attached to first pleading by Gwendolyn Antoine, Arielle M. Collins (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DOCKET SHEETS, #2 Exhibit CT ORDER, #3 Exhibit Signature form, #4 Exhibit injury evidence)(Robinson, Abby)
February 24, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Reconsideration re #18 Order on Motion to Compel,, Order on Motion to Stay Proceedings,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, by Gwendolyn Antoine, Arielle M. Collins (Robinson, Abby)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Compel; finding as moot #4 Motion to Stay Proceedings; denying #6 Motion to Dismiss; denying #9 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. The state-court proceedings are enjoined, and this matter will be administratively closed in this Court, subject to reopening by either party consistent with the FAA. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 2/22/2021 (LAT) Modified on 2/22/2021 (LAT).
February 15, 2021 Filing 17 Rebuttal re #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and MOTION to Stay Proceedings in State Court Action filed by Regions Bank (Slay, La'Toyia)
February 8, 2021 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss, #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction SAME MATTER IS FILED IN STATE COURT AS PLAINTIFFS filed by Regions Bank (Slay, La'Toyia)
February 8, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss, #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction SAME MATTER IS FILED IN STATE COURT AS PLAINTIFFS filed by Regions Bank (Slay, La'Toyia)
February 8, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #13 Answer to Complaint, AND RESPONSE TO ARBITRATION filed by Gwendolyn Antoine, Arielle M. Collins (Robinson, Abby)
February 8, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand and RESPONSE TO ARBITRATION in re #4 Motion to Compel re #12 Order, filed by Gwendolyn Antoine, Arielle M. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Docket, #2 Exhibit State Court lawsuit, #3 Exhibit Defendant Regions Answer lawsuit, #4 Exhibit Defendant Caroline E Answer, #5 Exhibit District Ct docket)(Robinson, Abby) Modified on 2/8/2021 to add linkage to docs. #4 and #12 (ND).
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: For the reasons set out in the Order, Defendants are directed to respond to the motion to compel arbitration #5 within seven (7) days of this Order. Plaintiff may reply within the normal deadlines. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III on February 5, 2021.(SP)
February 3, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regions Bank. Arielle M. Collins served on 1/31/2021, answer due 2/22/2021. (Slay, La'Toyia)
February 1, 2021 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction SAME MATTER IS FILED IN STATE COURT AS PLAINTIFFS filed by Gwendolyn Antoine, Arielle M. Collins (Robinson, Abby)
February 1, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction SAME MATTER IS FILED IN STATE COURT AS PLAINTIFFS by Gwendolyn Antoine, Arielle M. Collins (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Docket from state court, #2 Exhibit state court lawsuit, #3 Exhibit Answer from Regions in state court, #4 Exhibit Answer from Elmore in state court, #5 Exhibit Cover of Fed. Court filing)(Robinson, Abby)
January 27, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regions Bank. Gwendolyn Antoine served on 1/25/2021, answer due 2/16/2021. (Slay, La'Toyia)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY pursuant to L.U.Civ.R. 16(b)(3)(B) pending a decision on the Motion to Compel Arbitration at docket no. #4 . No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 1/26/2021. (JEJ)
January 26, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #6 . Incorrect event chosen in filing this document. This document should have been filed using the Motion to Dismiss event. Clerk has made the proper corrections. (ND)
January 25, 2021 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS BASED ON PARALLEL DOCTRINE OF DISTRICT COURT filed by Gwendolyn Antoine, Arielle M. Collins (Robinson, Abby) Modified on 1/26/2021 to fix docket text (ND).
January 25, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER THE PARALLEL DOCTRINE OF DISTRICT COURT by Gwendolyn Antoine, Arielle M. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit docket from state, #2 Exhibit complaint from state, #3 Exhibit Defendant answer, #4 Exhibit Defendant answer, #5 Exhibit docket from District)(Robinson, Abby) Modified on 1/26/2021 to correct docket event to a Motion (ND).
January 20, 2021 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and MOTION to Stay Proceedings in State Court Action filed by Regions Bank (Slay, La'Toyia)
January 20, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and, MOTION to Stay Proceedings in State Court Action by Regions Bank (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Kimberly Burkhalter Townsley, #2 Exhibit 1 to Exhibit A - Signature Card, #3 Exhibit 2 to Exhibit A - Authorization for International Transfer 1, #4 Exhibit 3 to Exhibit A - Authorization for International Transfer 2, #5 Exhibit 4 to Exhibit A - Regions Deposit Agreement, #6 Exhibit 5 to Exhibit A - International Funds Transfer Agreement)(Slay, La'Toyia)
January 20, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin McRae Watson on behalf of Regions Bank (Watson, Benjamin)
January 20, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Gwendolyn Antoine, Arielle M. Collins. (LAT)
January 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND PETITION FOR ORDER COMPELLING ARBITRATION AND FOR OTHER RELIEF against Gwendolyn Antoine, Arielle M. Collins ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0538-4464532), filed by Regions Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint in Antoine Suit (1), #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Kimberly Burkhalter Townsley (1), #3 Exhibit 1 to Exhibit B - Signature Card, #4 Exhibit 2 to Exhibit B - Authorization for International Transfer 1, #5 Exhibit 3 to Exhibit B - Authorization for International Transfer 2, #6 Exhibit 4 to Exhibit B - Regions Deposit Agreement, #7 Exhibit 5 to Exhibit B - International Funds Transfer Agreement, #8 Exhibit C - Kemp Consent to Arbitration Form, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Regions Bank v. Antoine et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regions Bank
Represented By: Benjamin McRae Watson
Represented By: La'Toyia J. Slay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arielle M. Collins
Represented By: Abby Gale Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwendolyn Antoine
Represented By: Abby Gale Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?