Origin Bank v. Haven Campus Communities-Starkville, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Origin Bank and Community Trust Bank
Defendant: Stephen H. Whisenant, Mark Boutwell, Watkins J. Blane, Jr., John A. Williams, Jr. and Haven Campus Communities-Starkville, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00061
Filed: January 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Tom S Lee
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2021 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Origin Bank (Wilson, Sarah)
March 3, 2021 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Watkins J. Blane, Jr, Mark Boutwell, Haven Campus Communities-Starkville, LLC, Stephen H. Whisenant, John A. Williams, Jr identifying Corporate Parent Haven Campus Communities Starkville Member, LLC for Haven Campus Communities-Starkville, LLC. (Noble, Douglas)
March 3, 2021 Filing 12 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 4/15/2021 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 1.888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 4/9/21. (KPM)
March 2, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Watkins J. Blane, Jr, Mark Boutwell, Haven Campus Communities-Starkville, LLC, Stephen H. Whisenant, John A. Williams, Jr.(Noble, Douglas)
February 24, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #7 : Attorney advises that there is an error in this entry, and it should be disregarded. It has been correctly refiled as Doc. #10 . (KNS)
February 24, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #6 : Attorney advises that there is an error in this entry, and it should be disregarded. It has been correctly refiled as Doc. #9 . (KNS)
February 24, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #5 : Attorney advises that there is an error in this entry, and it should be disregarded. It has been correctly refiled as Doc. #8 . (KNS)
February 24, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Origin Bank. John A. Williams, Jr served on 2/8/2021, answer due 3/1/2021. (Wilson, Sarah)
February 24, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Origin Bank. Stephen H. Whisenant served on 2/22/2021, answer due 3/15/2021. (Wilson, Sarah)
February 24, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Origin Bank. Haven Campus Communities-Starkville, LLC served on 2/22/2021, answer due 3/15/2021. (Wilson, Sarah)
February 24, 2021 Filing 7 ***ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY***SUMMONS Returned Executed by Origin Bank. John A. Williams, Jr served on 2/3/2021, answer due 2/24/2021. (Wilson, Sarah) Modified on 2/24/2021 (KNS).
February 24, 2021 Filing 6 ***ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY***SUMMONS Returned Executed by Origin Bank. Stephen H. Whisenant served on 2/18/2021, answer due 3/11/2021. (Wilson, Sarah) Modified on 2/24/2021 (KNS).
February 24, 2021 Filing 5 ***ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY***SUMMONS Returned Executed by Origin Bank. Haven Campus Communities-Starkville, LLC served on 2/18/2021, answer due 3/11/2021. (Wilson, Sarah) Modified on 2/24/2021 (KNS).
February 24, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Origin Bank. Mark Boutwell served on 2/8/2021, answer due 3/1/2021. (Wilson, Sarah)
February 24, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Origin Bank. Watkins J. Blane, Jr served on 2/5/2021, answer due 2/26/2021. (Wilson, Sarah)
February 1, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Watkins J. Blane, Jr, Mark Boutwell, Haven Campus Communities-Starkville, LLC, Stephen H. Whisenant, John A. Williams, Jr. (LAT)
January 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Watkins J. Blane, Jr, Haven Campus Communities-Starkville, LLC, Stephen H. Whisenant, John A. Williams, Jr, Mark Boutwell ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0538-4473509), filed by Origin Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Note, #3 Exhibit C - Deed, #4 Exhibit D - Agreement, #5 Exhibit E - Letter, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT) Modified on 2/1/2021 to add additional defendant (LAT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Origin Bank v. Haven Campus Communities-Starkville, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Origin Bank
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Community Trust Bank
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen H. Whisenant
Represented By: Douglas C. Noble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Boutwell
Represented By: Douglas C. Noble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watkins J. Blane, Jr.
Represented By: Douglas C. Noble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Williams, Jr.
Represented By: Douglas C. Noble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haven Campus Communities-Starkville, LLC
Represented By: Douglas C. Noble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?