Williamson v. Anderson Regional Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: Paul K. Williamson
Defendant: Anderson Regional Medical Center, Anderson Health System, John Does 1-10 and James D. Cady
Case Number: 3:2021cv00297
Filed: April 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Kristi H Johnson
2 Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Paul K. Williamson. Anderson Regional Medical Center waiver sent on 6/17/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (Jaques, Michael)
June 17, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Anderson Regional Medical Center, filed by Paul K. Williamson.(Jaques, Michael)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 4/28/2021 (VM)
April 27, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Anderson Regional Medical Center, James D. Cady, M.D. (VM)
April 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Anderson Regional Medical Center, James D. Cady (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0538-4540781), filed by Paul K. Williamson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(VM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williamson v. Anderson Regional Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson Regional Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson Health System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James D. Cady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul K. Williamson
Represented By: Michael T. Jaques
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?