Shinnie et al v. Smith Rayford et al
Plaintiff: Larkeshia Shinnie and Sonny A. Tobias
Defendant: Dr. Edith Faye Smith Rayford, John Does 1-5 and United States of America
Case Number: 3:2021cv00311
Filed: May 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Kristi H Johnson
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2021 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by United States of America (Bandi-Federal Gov, Tabitha)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #9 MOTION to Dismiss. Defendant's Reply is due on or before June 16, 2021. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by District Judge Kristi H. Johnson on 6/11/2021 (srd)
June 10, 2021 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 Response in Opposition to Motion by United States of America (Bandi-Federal Gov, Tabitha)
June 4, 2021 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #14 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Larkeshia Shinnie(Individually) (Martin, Warren)
June 4, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Larkeshia Shinnie(Individually) (Martin, Warren)
June 1, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 Emergency MOTION for Leave to File and/or Conduct Limited Remand-Related Discovery filed by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - FTCA Health Center Policy Manual)(Bandi-Federal Gov, Tabitha)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #9 MOTION to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' Response is due on or before June 4, 2021. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by District Judge Kristi H. Johnson on 5/25/2021 (srd)
May 24, 2021 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #9 MOTION to Dismiss by Larkeshia Shinnie(as the natural and biological parents of and on behalf of all wrongful death beneficiaries of Summer Rose Tobias, Deceased) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Email Correspondence between Counsel of Record)(Martin, Warren)
May 18, 2021 Filing 11 Emergency MOTION for Leave to File and/or Conduct Limited Remand-Related Discovery by Larkeshia Shinnie(Individually) (Attachments: #1 Errata A - Document Stating Dr. Rayford Did not Charge Plaintiff's Medicaid, #2 Exhibit B - Medical Document Listing Both Dr. Rayford and Medicaid information)(Martin, Warren)
May 13, 2021 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Meredith Torres)(Bandi-Federal Gov, Tabitha)
May 13, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by United States of America (Bandi-Federal Gov, Tabitha)
May 13, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Combined Memorandum of Law filed by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of E. Rayford, #2 Exhibit B - Employment Agreement, #3 Exhibit C- 2019 W-2 and Earnings Summary, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Meredith Torres, #5 Exhibit E - Grant Application)(Bandi-Federal Gov, Tabitha)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER staying discovery and disclosure requirements pending a ruling on the motion to remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on May 12, 2021 (KPM)
May 11, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #6 . Memoranda in support should be filed separately and shown as a related document to the motion (Court's Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Sec. 3.A.7). Attorney is directed to file the Memorandum as a separate document and link it to the appropriate document. (ND)
May 10, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Combined Memorandum of Law by Larkeshia Shinnie(Individually) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Plaintiffs' Initial Complaint, #2 Exhibit B Central Mississippi Health Services, Inc. Medical Records, #3 Exhibit C Merit Health Central Medical Records, #4 Exhibit D Central Mississippi Health Business Profile with Secretary of State, #5 Exhibit E Merit Health Central Business Profile with Secretary of State, #6 Exhibit F Merit Health Operative Report)(Martin, Warren)
May 10, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Substitution by Edith Faye Smith Rayford (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Acting U.S. Attorney)(Bandi-Federal Gov, Tabitha)
May 10, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Warren L. Martin, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Martin, Warren)
May 7, 2021 Filing 3 State Court Record by Defendants John Does 1-5, Edith Faye Smith Rayford Volumes 1 (Bandi-Federal Gov, Tabitha)
May 7, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Tabitha Bandi-Federal Gov on behalf of All Defendants (Bandi-Federal Gov, Tabitha)
May 6, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Edith Faye Smith Rayford from Hinds County Circuit Court, MS, case number 25CO1:20-cv-545-TTG. If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shinnie et al v. Smith Rayford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larkeshia Shinnie
Represented By: Kenya R. Martin
Represented By: Warren L. Martin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonny A. Tobias
Represented By: Kenya R. Martin
Represented By: Warren L. Martin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Edith Faye Smith Rayford
Represented By: Tabitha Bandi-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Represented By: Tabitha Bandi-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Tabitha Bandi-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?