Sicard v. Select Specialty Hospital-Jackson, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Phyllis Sicard
Defendant: Select Specialty Hospital-Jackson, Inc. and John Does 1-10
Case Number: 3:2021cv00464
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Kristi H Johnson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Select Specialty Hospital-Jackson, Inc. (Bobo, Robert)
September 8, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by Select Specialty Hospital-Jackson, Inc. (Bobo, Robert)
September 1, 2021 Reset Hearing: Telephonic Case Management Conference reset for 9/21/2021 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. (JEJ)
August 26, 2021 Filing 6 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 9/22/2021 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ)
July 30, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Wade, Jr on behalf of Select Specialty Hospital-Jackson, Inc. (Wade, John)
July 30, 2021 Filing 4 Summons returned Executed by Phyllis Sicard as to Select Specialty Hospital-Jackson, Inc. served on 7/26/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (Smith, Aubrey) Modified on 7/30/2021 (KNS).
July 30, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Select Specialty Hospital-Jackson, Inc..(Bobo, Robert)
July 30, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #4 : Incorrect event chosen. This document should have been docketed as Summons Returned Executed. Court staff will edit this docket entry to reflect correct event. Additionally, scanned document contains blank page. PDF documents should be checked for errors before filing. It is not necessary to refile. (KNS)
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Select Specialty Hospital-Jackson, Inc. (KNS)
July 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Does 1-10, Select Specialty Hospital-Jackson, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSSDC-4605788), filed by Phyllis Sicard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Intent to Sue, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Death, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sicard v. Select Specialty Hospital-Jackson, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Sicard
Represented By: Aubrey Bryan Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Specialty Hospital-Jackson, Inc.
Represented By: John E. Wade, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Lane Bobo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?