Fonville v. Kroger Clinton MS
Plaintiff: Anthony Fonville
Defendant: Kroger Clinton MS
Case Number: 3:2021cv00487
Filed: July 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Tom S Lee
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Filing 6 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 9/22/2021 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (A copy has been mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff at 118 Wooddell Court, Jackson, MS 38212.) (JEJ) (Main Document 6 replaced on 8/26/2021) (KNS). Modified on 8/26/2021 to correct date filed (KNS).
August 26, 2021 Reset Hearing: Telephonic Case Management Conference reset for 9/22/2021 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. Counsel for DEFENDANT shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (A copy has been mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff at 118 Wooddell Court Jackson, MS 38212.) (JEJ)
August 20, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Service of Request for Production by Kroger Clinton MS (Phillips, Michael)
August 20, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories by Kroger Clinton MS (Phillips, Michael)
July 23, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Kroger Clinton MS (Phillips, Michael)
July 23, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Claire K. Robinett on behalf of Kroger Clinton MS (Robinett, Claire)
July 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kroger Clinton MS from Circuit Court of Hinds County, Mississippi, case number 21-302. (Filing fee $402 receipt number AMSSDC-4615168) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(VM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fonville v. Kroger Clinton MS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Fonville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Clinton MS
Represented By: Claire K. Robinett
Represented By: Michael Earl Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?