Brown v. Anderson Regional Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: Erica Brown
Defendant: Anderson Regional Medical Center, Ericka Vaughn, Sandra Collins, John Does 1-10 and United States of America
Case Number: 3:2021cv00529
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Tom S Lee
Referring Judge: Robert P Myers
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2021 Filing 15 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF Receipt filed as to #14 Letter to Donna Jill Johnson, Circuit Clerk of Lauderdale County, Mississippi, transmitting certified copies of Order remanding case and docket sheet. (VM)
September 14, 2021 Filing 14 Letter to Donna Jill Johnson, Circuit Clerk of Lauderdale County, Mississippi, transmitting certified copies of Order remanding case and docket sheet. (VM)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. It is ordered that this action is remanded to the Circuit Court of Lauderdale County, Mississippi. Signed by District Judge Tom S. Lee on 9/14/2021 (VM)
September 7, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by United States of America (Paige-Federal Gov, Mitzi)
September 1, 2021 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, for Summary Judgment filed by United States of America (Norwood-Federal Gov, Andrew)
September 1, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, for Summary Judgment by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Intent Letter, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Meredith Torres)(Norwood-Federal Gov, Andrew). Added MOTION for Summary Judgment on 9/1/2021 (KNS).
September 1, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #10 : This document requests two motion reliefs. Each motion relief should be selected from the list of motion titles or each relief docketed separately. The same PDF document may be used for all motion filing entries. It is not necessary to refile as court staff has made the necessary correction. Attorney is advised to follow this procedure in future filings. (KNS)
August 30, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CLARIFICATION by Erica Brown (Langston, Shane)
August 30, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #9 : Attorney is advised to use Northern division name in future filings. (KNS)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. United States of America answer due by 9/22/2021. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on August 25, 2021 (King, Steve)
August 24, 2021 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by United States of America (Paige-Federal Gov, Mitzi)
August 18, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin B. Morgan on behalf of Anderson Regional Medical Center, Sandra Collins (Morgan, Benjamin)
August 18, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Peeler Grayson Lacey, Jr on behalf of Anderson Regional Medical Center, Sandra Collins (Lacey, Peeler)
August 18, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Romney H. Entrekin on behalf of Anderson Regional Medical Center, Sandra Collins (Entrekin, Romney)
August 18, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Substitution by Ericka Vaughn (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Scope of Employment Under 42 U.S.C. Section 233)(Paige-Federal Gov, Mitzi)
August 17, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew R. Norwood-Federal Gov on behalf of Ericka Vaughn (Norwood-Federal Gov, Andrew)
August 16, 2021 Filing 2 State Court Record by Defendant Ericka Vaughn Volumes 1 (Paige-Federal Gov, Mitzi)
August 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ericka Vaughn from Circuit Court of Lauderdale County, Mississippi, case number 21-51. If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(VM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Anderson Regional Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Brown
Represented By: Shane F. Langston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Romney H. Entrekin
Represented By: Benjamin B. Morgan
Represented By: Peeler Grayson Lacey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ericka Vaughn
Represented By: Mitzi Dease Paige-Federal Gov
Represented By: Andrew R. Norwood-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Collins
Represented By: Romney H. Entrekin
Represented By: Benjamin B. Morgan
Represented By: Peeler Grayson Lacey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Andrew R. Norwood-Federal Gov
Represented By: Mitzi Dease Paige-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?