Vaughan v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Peggy Vaughan
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA General Counsel
Case Number: 3:2021cv00534
Filed: August 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Kristi H Johnson
2 Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Peggy Vaughan. Commissioner of Social Security served on 9/27/2021, answer due 12/27/2021. Service made upon: U S Attorney; U S Attorney General; Commissioner of SSA. (Merritt, Hannalore)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 10/01/2021 (KNS) Modified on 10/4/2021 (CO).
October 1, 2021 Parties should include the newly assigned Magistrate Judge's initials RHWR on future filings. (KNS) Modified on 10/1/2021 (KNS).
September 14, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security; U.S. Attorney and Attorney General, U.S. Department of Justice. (KNS)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Requiring Answer and Briefing. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 9/2/21 (TS)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 9/1/21 (TS)
August 18, 2021 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Peggy Vaughan. (KNS)
August 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Peggy Vaughan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vaughan v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Vaughan
Represented By: Hannalore Burns Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?