Rice v. Ross Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Brenda Rice
Defendant: Ross Stores, Inc. d/b/a/ Ross Dress For Less
Case Number: 3:2021cv00557
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: LaKeysha Greer Isaac
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2021 Filing 7 Response in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Brenda Rice (Gibson, Cody) filed by Ross Stores, Inc. (Williams, Michael)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY AND CANCELLING CONFERENCE. The Telephonic Case Management Conference set for October 25, 2021 at 10:30am is hereby cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 9/20/21 (NL)
September 17, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Brenda Rice (Gibson, Cody)
September 14, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Slates C. Veazey on behalf of Ross Stores, Inc. (Veazey, Slates)
September 13, 2021 Filing 3 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/25/2021 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to isaac_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. The parties are instructed to use the following dial-in number for the conference call. Dial-in #:(888) 684-8852; Passcode: 3566012 (NL)
August 30, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Ross Stores, Inc..(Williams, Michael)
August 30, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #2 : Attorney is advised to include the correct judge assignment HTW-LGI on future filed pleadings. (KNS)
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ross Stores, Inc. from County Court of Rankin County, MS, case number 61CO1:21-cv-01095. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSSDC-4645249) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rice v. Ross Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Rice
Represented By: Cody W. Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Stores, Inc. d/b/a/ Ross Dress For Less
Represented By: Michael Casey Williams
Represented By: Slates C. Veazey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?